MD v. Barr
Petitioner: Farhad MD
Respondent: William Barr
Case Number: 4:2020cv00451
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time by William Barr. (Marshall, Mary)
May 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lester Marshall on behalf of William Barr (Marshall, Mary)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Respondents are ORDERED to show cause in writing within 20 days from the date of this order why the relief requested by Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 5/7/2020. (AHI )
May 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Change of Address by Farhad MD (AHI)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.00) (receipt number B4601105094)filed by Farhad MD.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MD v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Farhad MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?