Augustine v. Barr
Petitioner: Warren Trevor Augustine
Respondent: William Barr
Case Number: 4:2020cv00546
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The purpose of this Order is to notify the petitioner that the case will be treated by the court as ripe for summary disposition and to further inform the petitioner of his right to file affidavits or other materials to show why the petition should not be summarily denied or dismissed on the basis of the answer and record supplied by the respondent. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/27/20. (BJL)
May 27, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by William Barr. filed by William Barr (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Bryan Pitman)(Zeitlin, Benjamin)
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Zeitlin on behalf of William Barr (Zeitlin, Benjamin)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Respondent is ORDERED to appear and show cause in writing within 20 days from the entry date of this Order why the relief by Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 5/7/2020. (AHI )
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5, Receipt Number: B4601105512) filed by Warren Trevor Augustine.(AHI )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Augustine v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Warren Trevor Augustine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?