Sosnowchik v. Providelt Inc
Plaintiff: Shelbie Sosnowchik
Defendant: Providelt Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv00561
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shelbie Sosnowchik. Providelt Inc served (no date or signature on green card) (MRR, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Providelt Inc., sent via certified mail (MRR, )
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Shelbie Sosnowchik. (Hill, James)
April 24, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601105537 (AKD)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Providelt Inc, filed by Shelbie Sosnowchik.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sosnowchik v. Providelt Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelbie Sosnowchik
Represented By: James E Hill, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providelt Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?