Archilla et al v. Witte et al
Petitioner: Jose Antonio Garcia Rivera, Karim Tahir Golding, Landry Emily Mbendeke, Sarail Michael Archilla, Ray Fuller, Joseph Debonnaire Soho, Kenneth Manning, Churvin Webster, Alex Hernandez, Sergio Quito, Allen Roger Olano Esparza, Geovanny Gerardo Castellano, Bakhodir Madjitov, Domingo Castillo, Maxime P Blanc, Edson Flores, Tesfa Miller, Antonio Melquezideth Castro and Randane Williams
Respondent: Matthew T Albence, Dianne Witte, Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Jonathan Horton
Case Number: 4:2020cv00596
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER pursuant to the Petitioner's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, this action is DISMISSED without prejudice; costs taxed as paid. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/22/2020. (KAM)
June 19, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sarail Michael Archilla, Maxime P Blanc, Geovanny Gerardo Castellano, Antonio Melquezideth Castro, Edson Flores, Ray Fuller, Karim Tahir Golding, Alex Hernandez, Bakhodir Madjitov, Kenneth Manning, Tesfa Miller, Allen Roger Olano Esparza, Sergio Quito, Jose Antonio Garcia Rivera, Churvin Webster, Randane Williams (Vosburgh, Jessica)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER in light of the court's review of the Amended Petition, it is ORDERED that on or before 6/12/2020, counsel are DIRECTED to meet and confer, and on or before 6/19/2020, they SHALL file a joint report, addressing the issues as set out in this order. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/21/2020. (KAM)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER This case is before the court on Petitioners Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #2 ; after careful review of the briefing and the arguments presented to the court, and for the reasons explained in the contemporaneously filed Memorandum Opinion, Petitioners Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. #2 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/15/2020. (KAM)
May 15, 2020 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/15/2020. (KAM)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER After consideration of the record in this action, the court finds that Petitioners release on an order of supervised release has rendered his habeas corpus petition and accompanying Motion for TRO moot; Petitioner Joseph Debonnaire Soho's habeas corpus petition and his Motion for TRO are DISMISSED as MOOT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/14/2020. (KAM)
May 14, 2020 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re PHV Fee Paid, 21 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear, by Ghita R Schwarz on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Schwarz, Ghita)
May 13, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE by Sarail Michael Archilla, Maxime P Blanc, Geovanny Gerardo Castellano, Antonio Melquezideth Castro, Edson Flores, Ray Fuller, Karim Tahir Golding, Alex Hernandez, Bakhodir Madjitov, Kenneth Manning, Landry Emily Mbendeke, Tesfa Miller, Allen Roger Olano Esparza, Sergio Quito, Jose Antonio Garcia Rivera, Joseph Debonnaire Soho, Churvin Webster, Randane Williams of Post-Argument Supplemental Brief (Vosburgh, Jessica)
May 13, 2020 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT re #11 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Supplemental Declaration of Bryan Pitman) by Matthew T Albence, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Dianne Witte. filed by Matthew T Albence, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Dianne Witte (Wilson, Sarah)
May 12, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Telephone Conference held on 5/12/2020. Any supplemental briefs in support/opposition to motion shall be filed by 5/13/2020. A separate order will be entered by the court thereafter. (Court Reporter Risa Entrekin.) (KLL)
May 12, 2020 PHV Fee paid: for Astha Sharma Pokharel $75, receipt number B4601105848 (KAM)
May 11, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE to re #27 filed by Sarail Michael Archilla, Maxime P Blanc, Geovanny Gerardo Castellano, Antonio Melquezideth Castro, Edson Flores, Ray Fuller, Karim Tahir Golding, Alex Hernandez, Bakhodir Madjitov, Kenneth Manning, Landry Emily Mbendeke, Tesfa Miller, Allen Roger Olano Esparza, Sergio Quito, Jose Antonio Garcia Rivera, Joseph Debonnaire Soho, Churvin Webster, Randane Williams. (Vosburgh, Jessica)
May 8, 2020 PHV Fee paid for Ghita Schwarz in the amount of $75.00, Credit Card receipt number 1126-3587008, NDAL receipt #B4601105847. (Schwarz, Ghita) Modified on 5/8/2020 (JLC).
May 8, 2020 PHV Fee paid for Guadalupe Aguirre in the amount of $75.00, Credit Card receipt number 1126-3586925, NDAL receipt #B4601105846. (Alrabe, Khaled) Modified on 5/8/2020 (JLC).
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Telephone Hearing on Petitioners Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is set for 5/12/2020 03:00 PM before Judge R David Proctor. Counsel for Petitioners and Respondents are DIRECTED to dial-in to the conference by calling 866-434-5269 at the scheduled time. The access code is 6022965; In advance of the conference, or before Monday May 11, 2020 at 4:30 p.m., Petitioners SHALL submit a five (5) page brief regarding their position on the effect of the Eleventh Circuits recent decision in Swain v. Junior, -- F.3d --, 2020 WL 2161317, *1 (11th Cir. May 5, 2020). Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/8/2020. (KAM)
May 7, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE by Matthew T Albence, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Dianne Witte re #11 Response in Opposition to Motion, OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Swain v. Junior, --- F.3d --- (11th Cir. 2020))(Wilson, Sarah)
May 6, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sarail Michael Archilla, Maxime P Blanc, Geovanny Gerardo Castellano, Antonio Melquezideth Castro, Edson Flores, Ray Fuller, Karim Tahir Golding, Alex Hernandez, Bakhodir Madjitov, Kenneth Manning, Landry Emily Mbendeke, Tesfa Miller, Allen Roger Olano Esparza, Sergio Quito, Jose Antonio Garcia Rivera, Joseph Debonnaire Soho, Churvin Webster, Randane Williams. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jessica Myers Vosburgh, #2 Exhibit 23 - Huber Declaration, #3 Exhibit 24 - Dr. Venters Declaration, #4 Exhibit 25 - Supplemental Williams Declaration, #5 Exhibit 26 - Supplemental Golding Declaration, #6 Exhibit 27 - Reichlin-Melnick Declaration, #7 Exhibit 28 - Court Orders)(Vosburgh, Jessica)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER -- This matter is before the court on Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed on behalf of Attorney Angelo Guisado #16 . Plaintiffs Motion #16 is CONDITIONALLY GRANTED. Attorney Guisado SHALL pay the $75.00 admission fee on or before May 8, 2020. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/6/2020. (KAM)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER -- This matter is before the court on Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed on behalf of Attorney Baher Azmy #15 . Plaintiffs Motion #15 is CONDITIONALLY GRANTED. Attorney Azmy SHALL pay the $75.00 admission fee on or before May 8, 2020. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/6/2020. (KAM)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER -- This matter is before the court on Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed on behalf of Attorney Guadalupe Aguirre #14 . Plaintiffs Motion #14 is CONDITIONALLY GRANTED. Attorney Aguirre SHALL pay the $75.00 admission fee on or before May 8, 2020. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/6/2020. (KAM)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER -- This matter is before the court on Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed on behalf of Attorney Astha Sharma Pokharel #17 . Plaintiffs Motion #17 is CONDITIONALLY GRANTED. Attorney Sharma Pokharel SHALL pay the $75.00 admission fee on or before May 8, 2020. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/6/2020. (KAM)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER -- This matter is before the court on Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed on behalf of Attorney Ghita Schwarz #18 . Plaintiffs Motion #18 is CONDITIONALLY GRANTED. Attorney Schwarz SHALL pay the $75.00 admission fee on or before May 8, 2020. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/6/2020. (KAM)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER -- This matter is before the court on Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed on behalf of Attorney Brittany Thomas #19 . Plaintiffs Motion #19 is CONDITIONALLY GRANTED. Attorney Thomas SHALL pay the $75.00 admission fee on or before May 8, 2020. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/6/2020. (KAM)
May 6, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarail Michael Archilla, Maxime P Blanc, Geovanny Gerardo Castellano, Antonio Melquezideth Castro, Edson Flores, Ray Fuller, Karim Tahir Golding, Alex Hernandez, Bakhodir Madjitov, Kenneth Manning, Landry Emily Mbendeke, Tesfa Miller, Allen Roger Olano Esparza, Sergio Quito, Jose Antonio Garcia Rivera, Joseph Debonnaire Soho, Churvin Webster, Randane Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Brittany Thomas)(Vosburgh, Jessica)
May 6, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarail Michael Archilla, Maxime P Blanc, Geovanny Gerardo Castellano, Antonio Melquezideth Castro, Edson Flores, Ray Fuller, Karim Tahir Golding, Alex Hernandez, Bakhodir Madjitov, Kenneth Manning, Landry Emily Mbendeke, Tesfa Miller, Allen Roger Olano Esparza, Sergio Quito, Jose Antonio Garcia Rivera, Joseph Debonnaire Soho, Churvin Webster, Randane Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Ghita Schwarz)(Vosburgh, Jessica)
May 6, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarail Michael Archilla, Maxime P Blanc, Geovanny Gerardo Castellano, Antonio Melquezideth Castro, Edson Flores, Ray Fuller, Karim Tahir Golding, Alex Hernandez, Bakhodir Madjitov, Kenneth Manning, Landry Emily Mbendeke, Tesfa Miller, Allen Roger Olano Esparza, Sergio Quito, Jose Antonio Garcia Rivera, Joseph Debonnaire Soho, Churvin Webster, Randane Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Astha Sharma Pokharel)(Vosburgh, Jessica)
May 6, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarail Michael Archilla, Maxime P Blanc, Geovanny Gerardo Castellano, Antonio Melquezideth Castro, Edson Flores, Ray Fuller, Karim Tahir Golding, Alex Hernandez, Bakhodir Madjitov, Kenneth Manning, Landry Emily Mbendeke, Tesfa Miller, Allen Roger Olano Esparza, Sergio Quito, Jose Antonio Garcia Rivera, Joseph Debonnaire Soho, Churvin Webster, Randane Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Angelo Guisado)(Vosburgh, Jessica)
May 6, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarail Michael Archilla, Maxime P Blanc, Geovanny Gerardo Castellano, Antonio Melquezideth Castro, Edson Flores, Ray Fuller, Karim Tahir Golding, Alex Hernandez, Bakhodir Madjitov, Kenneth Manning, Landry Emily Mbendeke, Tesfa Miller, Allen Roger Olano Esparza, Sergio Quito, Jose Antonio Garcia Rivera, Joseph Debonnaire Soho, Churvin Webster, Randane Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Baher Azmy)(Vosburgh, Jessica)
May 6, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarail Michael Archilla, Maxime P Blanc, Geovanny Gerardo Castellano, Antonio Melquezideth Castro, Edson Flores, Ray Fuller, Karim Tahir Golding, Alex Hernandez, Bakhodir Madjitov, Kenneth Manning, Landry Emily Mbendeke, Tesfa Miller, Allen Roger Olano Esparza, Sergio Quito, Jose Antonio Garcia Rivera, Joseph Debonnaire Soho, Churvin Webster, Randane Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Guadalupe Aguirre)(Vosburgh, Jessica)
May 5, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Sarail Michael Archilla, Maxime P Blanc, Geovanny Gerardo Castellano, Antonio Melquezideth Castro, Edson Flores, Ray Fuller, Karim Tahir Golding, Alex Hernandez, Bakhodir Madjitov, Kenneth Manning, Landry Emily Mbendeke, Tesfa Miller, Allen Roger Olano Esparza, Sergio Quito, Jose Antonio Garcia Rivera, Joseph Debonnaire Soho, Churvin Webster, Randane Williams Letter to Court (Alrabe, Khaled)
May 5, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lester Marshall on behalf of Matthew T Albence, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Dianne Witte (Marshall, Mary)
May 4, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Matthew T Albence, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Dianne Witte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Facility Response Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2: Detainees' Status Declaration)(Wilson, Sarah)
May 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R Cheek on behalf of Matthew T Albence, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Dianne Witte (Cheek, Jason)
April 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Sarail Michael Archilla, Maxime P Blanc, Geovanny Gerardo Castellano, Antonio Melquezideth Castro, Edson Flores, Ray Fuller, Karim Tahir Golding, Alex Hernandez, Bakhodir Madjitov, Kenneth Manning, Landry Emily Mbendeke, Tesfa Miller, Allen Roger Olano Esparza, Sergio Quito, Jose Antonio Garcia Rivera, Joseph Debonnaire Soho, Churvin Webster re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Vosburgh, Jessica)
April 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Stevens Wilson on behalf of Matthew T Albence (Wilson, Sarah)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Stevens Wilson on behalf of Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Dianne Witte (Wilson, Sarah)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER This case is before the court on Petitioners Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (TRO) #2 , filed on April 29, 2020; To the extent they have not already done so, Petitioners are DIRECTED to serve Respondents with copies of their Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 and Motion for TRO #2 ; Respondents are DIRECTED to file a response by May 4, 2020; Petitioners SHALL reply by May 6, 2020. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/30/2020. (KAM)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice attorney Khaled Alrabe, but with the understanding and on the condition he pay the applicable fee and register for e-filing and notification within 14 days, unless he has already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 4/30/2020. (AVC)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER in 4:20-cv-304-AKK To avoid any allegations of judge shopping, the Clerk is DIRECTED to open a new, separate case for the Corrected Amended Complaint #11 . Signed by Judge Abdul K. Kallon on 4/29/2020. (KAM)
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarail Michael Archilla, Maxime P Blanc, Geovanny Gerardo Castellano, Antonio Melquezideth Castro, Edson Flores, Ray Fuller, Karim Tahir Golding, Alex Hernandez, Bakhodir Madjitov, Kenneth Manning, Landry Emily Mbendeke, Tesfa Miller, Allen Roger Olano Esparza, Sergio Quito, Jose Antonio Garcia Rivera, Joseph Debonnaire Soho, Churvin Webster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Khaled Alrabe)(Vosburgh, Jessica)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Sarail Michael Archilla, Maxime P Blanc, Geovanny Gerardo Castellano, Antonio Melquezideth Castro, Edson Flores, Ray Fuller, Karim Tahir Golding, Alex Hernandez, Bakhodir Madjitov, Kenneth Manning, Landry Emily Mbendeke, Tesfa Miller, Allen Roger Olano Esparza, Sergio Quito, Jose Antonio Garcia Rivera, Joseph Debonnaire Soho, Churvin Webster. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Jessica Myers Vosburgh, #3 Exhibit 1-22)(Vosburgh, Jessica)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Churvin Webster, Kenneth Manning, Antonio Melquezideth Castro, Alex Hernandez, Sarail Michael Archilla, Landry Emily Mbendeke, Sergio Quito, Tesfa Miller, Allen Roger Olano Esparza, Maxime P Blanc, Edson Flores, Jose Antonio Garcia Rivera, Karim Tahir Golding, Bakhodir Madjitov, Ray Fuller, Joseph Debonnaire Soho, Geovanny Gerardo Castellano.(JLC) (originally filed in 4:20-cv-304-AKK) Modified on 4/30/2020 (KAM, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Archilla et al v. Witte et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Antonio Garcia Rivera
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Khaled Alrabe
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Karim Tahir Golding
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Khaled Alrabe
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Landry Emily Mbendeke
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Khaled Alrabe
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sarail Michael Archilla
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Ghita R Schwarz
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Khaled Alrabe
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ray Fuller
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Khaled Alrabe
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Debonnaire Soho
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Khaled Alrabe
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenneth Manning
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Khaled Alrabe
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Churvin Webster
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Khaled Alrabe
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alex Hernandez
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Khaled Alrabe
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sergio Quito
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Khaled Alrabe
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Allen Roger Olano Esparza
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Khaled Alrabe
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Geovanny Gerardo Castellano
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Khaled Alrabe
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bakhodir Madjitov
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Khaled Alrabe
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Domingo Castillo
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Khaled Alrabe
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maxime P Blanc
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Khaled Alrabe
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edson Flores
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Khaled Alrabe
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tesfa Miller
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Khaled Alrabe
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antonio Melquezideth Castro
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Khaled Alrabe
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Randane Williams
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew T Albence
Represented By: Sarah Stevens Wilson
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Represented By: Jason R Cheek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dianne Witte
Represented By: Sarah Stevens Wilson
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Represented By: Jason R Cheek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Sarah Stevens Wilson
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Represented By: Jason R Cheek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jonathan Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?