Harris v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Heather Danielle Harris
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2020cv00710
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 6/12/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. (BJL)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General by Clerk for service via USMS. (BJL)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on May 20, 2020. (ADH)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 5/20/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Heather Danielle Harris. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(BJL)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner filed by Heather Danielle Harris.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Danielle Harris
Represented By: Myron K Allenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?