Dubose v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Christina Lynn Dubose
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2020cv00760
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christina Lynn Dubose. Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 7/13/2020, answer due 10/11/2020. (KEK)
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by You-Jin Han on behalf of Social Security Administration, Commissioner (Han, You-Jin)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Delivered to US Marshals for service. (KEK)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/1/2020. (RLW)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christina Lynn Dubose. (Attachments: #1 IFP Affidavit)(KEK)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner, filed by Christina Lynn Dubose.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dubose v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Represented By: You-Jin Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Lynn Dubose
Represented By: Myron K Allenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?