Lankford v. Nationwide Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Doris Lankford
Defendant: Nationwide Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00866
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1002
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Nationwide Life Insurance Company Notice of Settlement (Stuart, Sharon)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant must now respond by Friday, August 14, 2020. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 7/23/20.(SAM1)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Nationwide Life Insurance Company. (Stuart, Sharon)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant now has until Friday, July 24, 2020, to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 6/24/20. (SAM1)
June 19, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3613939. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide Life Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Etowah County, case number 31-CV-2020-900170.00, filed by Nationwide Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Notice of Filing, # 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(SRD). (Stuart, Sharon)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Nationwide Life Insurance Company. (Stuart, Sharon)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide Life Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Etowah County, case number 31-CV-2020-900170.00, filed by Nationwide Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Notice of Filing, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(SRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lankford v. Nationwide Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Lankford
Represented By: Myron K Allenstein
Represented By: Rose Marie Allenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Sharon D Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?