Sims v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Annette Sims
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2020cv01183
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 9/2/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. (BJL)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General by Clerk for service via USMS. (BJL)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/17/20. (BJL)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial (AHI)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE that counsel for the plaintiff is required to provide the social security number of the plaintiff to the US Attorney's Office within 10 days. The notice is to be given to the US Attorney outside of the electronic filing system. (AHI )
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 8/14/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Annette Sims. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(AHI)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner filed by Annette Sims.(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sims v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Sims
Represented By: Ralph K Strawn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?