Holloway v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Richard Holloway
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2020cv01184
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Holloway. Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 9/18/2020, answer due 12/17/2020. (KEK)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Delivered to USMS for service. (MEB2)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 8/21/2020. (SRD)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard Holloway. (Attachments: #1 IFP Affidavit)(SRD)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner, filed by Richard Holloway.(SRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holloway v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Holloway
Represented By: Ralph K Strawn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?