Linton v. Lowe's Home Centers LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nicki Linton
Defendant: Bryant Cross and Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv01411
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius: Telephone Conference held on 11/16/2020; only attorney Stott participated. (BST, )
November 12, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE to remind parties of consent telephone conference scheduled for 11:00 AM on Monday, 11/16/20; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, 24 hours in advance, the conference will be cancelled. (BST)
November 11, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by Nicki Linton. (Smitherman, Mary Ruth) Modified text on 11/12/2020 (MRR, ).
November 11, 2020 Filing 11 Byrant Cross' Joinder in MOTION To Dismiss and Preservation of Affirmative Defenses by Bryant Cross. (Spinks, James) Modified text on 11/12/2020 (MRR, ).
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than December 10, 2020. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after December 10, 2020. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 11:00 a.m. on November 16, 2020. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/28/20. (MRR, )
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/1/2020; Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/27/2020. (BST, )
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James Lawrence Spinks on behalf of Bryant Cross (Spinks, James)
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. (Stott, Joseph)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicki Linton. Lowe's Home Centers LLC served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (MRR, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicki Linton. Bryant Cross served on 10/7/2020 (no date on green card), answer due 10/28/2020. (MRR, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bryant Cross, Lowe's Home Centers LLC. Mailed certified mail (MEB2)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Nicki Linton. (Smitherman, Mary Ruth)
September 24, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3678421 (B4601108634). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Nicki Linton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(MRR, ). (Smitherman, Mary Ruth) Modified on 9/24/2020 (MRR, ).
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Nicki Linton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linton v. Lowe's Home Centers LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicki Linton
Represented By: Harvey B Campbell, Jr
Represented By: Jonathan Gabriel Carpenter
Represented By: Mary Ruth Campbell Smitherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant Cross
Represented By: James Lawrence Spinks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Represented By: Joseph E Stott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?