Crabtree v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Leonard Crabtree
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2020cv01676
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leonard Crabtree. Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 11/23/2020, answer due 2/21/2021. (MEB2)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Delivered to USM for service. (MEB2)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/26/2020. (KAM)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Leonard Crabtree. (Attachments: #1 IFP Affidavit) (MEB2)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner, filed by Leonard Crabtree. (MEB2)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE that counsel for the plaintiff shall provide the plaintiff's social security number to the US Attorney's Office within 10 days. This notice is to be made outside of the CM/ECF electronic filing system. (MEB2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crabtree v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Crabtree
Represented By: Ralph K Strawn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?