Waites v. Halsted Financial Services LCC
Plaintiff: Logan Waites
Defendant: Halsted Financial Services LLCC and Halsted Financial Services LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv01902
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Logan Waites (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Philipps, David)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 1/20/21. (MRR, )
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: The motion seeking leave for Eugene Xerxes Martin, IV, to appear pro hac vice on behalf of the defendant in this action (Doc. #11 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 1/20/21. (MRR, )
January 19, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission (Pro Hac Vice) for Eugene Xerxes Martin IVMotion is RIPE 1/19/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Halsted Financial Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Local Counsel, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Martin, Eugene) Modified text on 1/20/2021 (MRR, ).
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than February 26, 2021. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after February 26, 2021. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:30 a.m. on February 1, 2021. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 1/19/21. (MRR, )
January 19, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3755801 (B4601110867). (Martin, Eugene) Modified on 1/19/2021 (MEB2).
January 12, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Halsted Financial Services LLC. filed by Halsted Financial Services LLC (Moore, Neal)
January 12, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Halsted Financial Services LLC.(Moore, Neal)
January 4, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Logan Waites. Halsted Financial Services LLC served on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (MRR, )
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps have filed a motion seeking admission pro hac vice to represent the plaintiff, Logan Waites, in this action. (Doc. #3 ). The motion is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 12/15/20. (MRR, )
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Halsted Financial Services LCC. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2)
December 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
December 1, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3725577 (B4601109953). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Halsted Financial Services LLCC, filed by Logan Waites. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(MRR, ). (Philipps, David) Modified on 12/1/2020 (MRR, ).
December 1, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3725578 (B4601109954). (Philipps, David) Modified on 12/1/2020 (MRR, ).
December 1, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3725581 (B4601109955). (Philipps, David) Modified on 12/1/2020 (MRR, ).
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David J Philipps and Mary E. Philipps Motion is RIPE 11/30/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Logan Waites. (Attachments: #1 Consent of local counsel)(MRR, ) Modified on 12/1/2020 (MRR, ).
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Logan Waites. (MRR, )
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Halsted Financial Services LLCC, filed by Logan Waites. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waites v. Halsted Financial Services LCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halsted Financial Services LLCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halsted Financial Services LLC
Represented By: Neal D Moore, III
Represented By: Eugene Xerxes Martin, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Logan Waites
Represented By: Bradford W Botes
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?