Ezell v. Dunn et al
Plaintiff: Lakeisha Ezell
Defendant: Tanya Ary, Jefferson Dunn, Kevin White, Edward Ellington, Gary Malone, Gwendolyn Givens, Karla Jones, Charles Daniels, Larry Baker, Carl Sanders, Carla Graham, Grantt Culliver, Jeffery Williams, Anthony Brooks and Neketris Estelle
Case Number: 4:2020cv02058
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Filing 27 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Gwendolyn Givens. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK)
February 19, 2021 Filing 26 Summons Issued as to Charles Daniels. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
February 19, 2021 Filing 25 Summons and Complaint Returned With COVID-19 Notation from Postal Employee as to Carl Sanders by Lakeisha Ezell. (KEK)
February 19, 2021 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lakeisha Ezell. Anthony Brooks served on 2/12/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. (Brown, Ruth)
February 19, 2021 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lakeisha Ezell. Grantt Culliver served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021. (Brown, Ruth)
February 18, 2021 Filing 22 Request for service by certified mail filed by Lakeisha Ezell. (Pierce, Megan)
February 17, 2021 Filing 21 Summons and Complaint Returned With COVID-19 Notation from Postal Employee as to Gwendolyn Givens by Lakeisha Ezell. (KEK)
February 10, 2021 Filing 20 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Gwendolyn Givens, Carl Sanders. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
February 10, 2021 Filing 19 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Anthony Brooks, Karla Jones, Carl Sanders. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS Defendants Jefferson Dunn, Jeffrey Williams, and Edward Ellington's unopposed motion for an extension of time to file a responsive pleading. (Doc. #15 ). Defendants Dunn, Williams, and Ellington SHALL file a responsive pleading on or before March 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 2/2/2021. (KEK)
February 2, 2021 Filing 17 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Lakeisha Ezell as to Carl Sanders. (KEK)
February 2, 2021 Filing 16 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Lakeisha Ezell as to Karla Jones. (KEK)
January 28, 2021 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Jefferson Dunn, Edward Ellington, Jeffery Williams. (Rogers, Stephen)
January 28, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by C Richard Hill, Jr on behalf of Tanya Ary, Larry Baker, Neketris Estelle, Carla Graham, Gary Malone, Carl Sanders, Kevin White (Hill, C)
January 28, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James N Walter, Jr on behalf of Tanya Ary, Larry Baker, Neketris Estelle, Carla Graham, Gary Malone, Carl Sanders, Kevin White (Walter, James)
January 28, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F Northcutt on behalf of Tanya Ary, Larry Baker, Neketris Estelle, Carla Graham, Gary Malone, Carl Sanders, Kevin White (Northcutt, Robert)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: Before the court is Defendants Gary Malone, Carla Graham, Neketris Estelle, Larry Baker, and Tanya Ary's motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint. (Doc. #10 ). The court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART the motion. Defendants Malone, Graham, Estelle, Baker, and Ary SHALL file a responsive pleading on or before February 22, 2021. This extension of time does not apply to any other named Defendant. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 1/22/2021. (KEK)
January 21, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Motion for Extension of Time by Tanya Ary, Larry Baker, Neketris Estelle, Carla Graham, Gary Malone. (Walter, James)
January 20, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lakeisha Ezell. Tanya Ary served on 12/31/2020, answer due 1/21/2021; Larry Baker served on 12/31/2020, answer due 1/21/2021; Jefferson Dunn served on 1/7/2021, answer due 1/28/2021; Edward Ellington served on 1/7/2021, answer due 1/28/2021; Neketris Estelle served on 12/31/2020, answer due 1/21/2021; Carla Graham served on 12/31/2020, answer due 1/21/2021; Gary Malone served on 12/31/2020, answer due 1/21/2021; Jeffery Williams served on 1/7/2021, answer due 1/28/2021. (KEK)
January 12, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Grantt Culliver. Returned to plaintiff for service. (MEB2)
December 29, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Tanya Ary, Larry Baker, Jefferson Dunn, Edward Ellington, Neketris Estelle, Gwendolyn Givens, Carla Graham, Karla Jones, Gary Malone, Carl Sanders, Kevin White, Jeffery Williams. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
December 29, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3742622. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Tanya Ary, Larry Baker, Anthony Brooks, Grantt Culliver, Charles Daniels, Jefferson Dunn, Edward Ellington, Neketris Estelle, Gwendolyn Givens, Carla Graham, Karla Jones, Gary Malone, Carl Sanders, Kevin White, filed by Lakeisha Ezell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(KEK). (Pierce, Megan)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER - The court GRANTS #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Megan Pierce. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 12/23/20. (SAC)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER - The court grants #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Ruth Brown. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 12/23/20. (SAC)
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Lakeisha Ezell. (Attachments: #1 Errata Ex. A, Cert of Good Standing)(Mujumdar, Anil)
December 23, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Lakeisha Ezell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, Cert of Good Standing)(Mujumdar, Anil)
December 23, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3740844. (Mujumdar, Anil)
December 23, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3740852. (Mujumdar, Anil)
December 22, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Lakeisha Ezell. (KEK)
December 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tanya Ary, Larry Baker, Anthony Brooks, Grantt Culliver, Charles Daniels, Jefferson Dunn, Edward Ellington, Neketris Estelle, Gwendolyn Givens, Carla Graham, Karla Jones, Gary Malone, Carl Sanders, Kevin White, filed by Lakeisha Ezell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ezell v. Dunn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Ary
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Dunn
Represented By: Stephen C Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin White
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Ellington
Represented By: Stephen C Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Malone
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Baker
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Sanders
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Graham
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grantt Culliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Williams
Represented By: Stephen C Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neketris Estelle
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakeisha Ezell
Represented By: Megan Colleen Pierce
Represented By: Ruth Zemel Brown
Represented By: Anil A Mujumdar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?