Johnson v. Walmart Inc
Plaintiff: Terry Johnson
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv02092
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER Telephone Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, March 9, 2021 at 3:00 PM before Judge Corey L. Maze. Counsel are to dial 877-873-8018 and enter access code 6714714 to participate. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 2/18/2021. (SRD)
February 17, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Pearce, Julie)
February 12, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Inc. filed by Walmart Inc (Pearce, Julie)
February 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Michael J Marable by Walmart Inc. filed by Walmart Inc (Pearce, Julie) Modified docket text on 2/12/2021 (KEK).
February 12, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Inc. filed by Walmart Inc (Pearce, Julie)
February 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Jason Marable on behalf of Walmart Inc (Marable, Michael)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 1/8/2021. (SRD)
January 6, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Walmart Inc.(Pearce, Julie)
January 6, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3746791 (B4601110635). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc from Circuit Court of Etowah County, case number 2020-CV-900668. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (SRD). (Pearce, Julie) Modified on 1/6/2021 (MEB2).
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc from Circuit Court of Etowah County, case number 2020-CV-900668. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (SRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Walmart Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Johnson
Represented By: Gina D Coggin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Julie Davis Pearce
Represented By: Michael Jason Marable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?