Collings v. Marshall County, Alabama et al
Plaintiff: Eujena Rogers Collings
Defendant: James Dee Walker, Timothy Allen Jolley, Mitchell Scott Floyd, David Jackson Evans, Marshall County, Alabama, Phillip Craig Sims, Steven Troy Marshall, Edward Lane Kellett, Keith Wayne Wilson, Jimmy Frank Carnes, David William Atwell, Timothy Francis Riley, Albertville, Alabama, City of and Tracy Lane Honea
Case Number: 4:2021cv00655
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to file amended complaint by Eujena Rogers Collings, J Monroe Johnson. Associated Cases: 4:21-cv-00519-ACA, 4:21-cv-00655-ACA, 4:21-cv-00707-ACA(KEK)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER in case 4:21-cv-00519-ACA; granting in part and denying in part (14) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:21-cv-00707-ACA. The court CONSOLIDATES the three actions captioned within. Plaintiffs J. Monroe Johnson and Eugenia Collings SHALL file and amended consolidated complaint on or before July 6, 2021 in case 4:21-cv-519 only. Further instructions within. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/15/21. Associated Cases: 4:21-cv-00519-ACA, 4:21-cv-00655-ACA, 4:21-cv-00707-ACA(MRR, )
June 15, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Annemarie Carney Axon: Telephone Conference held on 6/15/2021 re motion to consolidate in: 21-707 Collings/Johnson (related to 21-696: Chappell; 21-655: Collings; 21-519: Johnson). Present: Eujena Collings, J Monroe Johnson, T Mark Maclin, Brad A Chynoweth, Sara M Rossmanith, Allison B Chandler, Roger Coit Chappell. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter Margaret Wasmund) (SAC)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Pending before the court in Collings v. Marshall Cnty., et al., 4:21-cv-707-ACA is a joint motion to consolidate. The court sets a Telephone Conference for June 15, 2021, 11:00 AM, before Judge Annemarie Carney Axon. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/3/21. (SAC) Modified on 6/4/2021 (SAC).
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: The court REMINDS Plaintiff Eujena Rogers Collings that she is responsible for serving the defendants in this case with the summons and complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 5/12/2021. (KEK)
May 11, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT - The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable Annemarie Carney Axon. Please use case number 4:21-cv-655-ACA on all subsequent pleadings. (KEK)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - The undersigned hereby recuses himself from further participation in the above-styled action. The Clerk is DIRECTED to randomly reassign this case to another district judge in accordance with the clerk's normal procedures. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 5/11/2021. (KEK)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Albertville, Alabama, City of, David William Atwell, Jimmy Frank Carnes, David Jackson Evans, Mitchell Scott Floyd, Tracy Lane Honea, Timothy Allen Jolley, Edward Lane Kellett, Steven Troy Marshall, Marshall County, Alabama, Timothy Francis Riley, Phillip Craig Sims, James Dee Walker, Keith Wayne Wilson (Filing fee $ 402.00 ALND receipt #B4601113254), filed by Eujena Rogers Collings. (MEB2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collings v. Marshall County, Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dee Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Allen Jolley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Scott Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Jackson Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall County, Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Craig Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Troy Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Lane Kellett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Wayne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Frank Carnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David William Atwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Francis Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertville, Alabama, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Lane Honea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eujena Rogers Collings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?