Williams v. Dunn et al
Plaintiff: Marcellus Williams
Defendant: Jefferson Dunn, Arnaldo Mercado, Scott Sides, Edward Ellington, Terrance McDonnell, Ruth Naglich, Matthew Brand, Grantt Culliver, Charles Daniels, Jeffery Williams, Jenny Abbott, Leon Bolling, Errol Pickens, Gary Malone, Kevin White, Jacob Weaver, Latonya Scott, Derrick Dent, Wilbert Howard and Worthy Crawford
Case Number: 4:2021cv00921
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marcellus Williams. Jenny Abbott waiver sent on 7/14/2021, answer due 9/12/2021; Jefferson Dunn waiver sent on 7/14/2021, answer due 9/12/2021; Edward Ellington waiver sent on 7/14/2021, answer due 9/12/2021; Arnaldo Mercado waiver sent on 7/14/2021, answer due 9/12/2021; Jeffery Williams waiver sent on 7/14/2021, answer due 9/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acceptance and Waiver of Service)(Little, Benjamin)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Counsel for plaintiff Meghan S. Cole has filed a motion for leave to withdraw. (Doc. #4 ). For good cause shown, the court ORDERS that Meghan S. Cole's motion to withdraw as counsel for the plaintiff is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/6/2021. (KEK)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Marcellus Williams. (Cole, Meghan)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Patrick F. Linehan, counsel for plaintiff, has filed a motion for admission pro hac vice, and a declaration in accordance with Local Rule 83.1(b). (Doc. #2 ). Attorney Linehan also has paid the applicable fee. Accordingly, the motion for admission pro hac vice is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/15/2021. (KEK)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Limited Admission of Patrick F. Linehan by Marcellus Williams. (Little, Benjamin)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3882832. (Little, Benjamin)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jenny Abbott, Leon Bolling, Matthew Brand, Worthy Crawford, Grantt Culliver, Charles Daniels, Derrick Dent, Jefferson Dunn, Edward Ellington, Wilbert Howard, Gary Malone, Terrance McDonnell, Arnaldo Mercado, Ruth Naglich, Errol Pickens, Latonya Scott, Scott Sides, Jacob Weaver, Kevin White, filed by Marcellus Williams.(KEK)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3878635 (ALND B4601114467) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Jenny Abbott, Leon Bolling, Matthew Brand, Worthy Crawford, Grantt Culliver, Charles Daniels, Derrick Dent, Jefferson Dunn, Edward Ellington, Wilbert Howard, Gary Malone, Terrance McDonnell, Arnaldo Mercado, Ruth Naglich, Errol Pickens, Latonya Scott, Scott Sides, Jacob Weaver, Kevin White, filed by Marcellus Williams.(KEK). (Little, Benjamin) Modified on 7/7/2021 (KEK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Dunn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcellus Williams
Represented By: Benjamin R Little
Represented By: Meghan Salvati Cole
Represented By: Patrick F Linehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnaldo Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Sides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Ellington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance McDonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Naglich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Brand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grantt Culliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Bolling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Errol Pickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latonya Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrick Dent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbert Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worthy Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?