Kendrick et al v. Apple Inc
Plaintiff: Kim Kendrick, Brianna Kruz Smith, Cassandra White, Karen Vest, Anita Quitoriano, Jeremy Daniel Wofford, Stephen Jenkins, Carla Jenkins, Phillip Gowens, Eric Powell, Christopher Hill, Andrea Mershon, Barbara Richardson, Jessica Ponder, Mike Herndon, Edward Timothy Collier, Joan Collett Collier, Trela Nelson, Bridgitte Rogers Blankenship, Diane Baldwin, Jason Everett, Katara Lane, Terry Williams, Mlissa Mazzeo, Jodi Clements, Elizabeth Thein, Rebecca Burns, Steven Battles, Rosemary Battles, Michael Boatwright, Tammy Hudgins, Candis Posey, Margaret Limbaugh, Anthony Land, Taylor Henry, Brandy Deeann Higdon, Toni Ballinger, Tangela Butler, Lavenia Diane Fisher, Larissa Gunnells, Debbie Duke, Tracy Higgins, Nathan Small, Becky Farmer, Dennis Jay Farmer, Leslie Farmer, Kathy Glaze and Brooke Wood
Defendant: Apple Inc
Case Number: 4:2021cv00976
Filed: July 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER GRANTING #11 Joint Motion to Stay Rule 26 Obligations Pending Ruling on Consolidation. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 9/9/2021. (KEK)
September 9, 2021 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Stay Rule 26 Obligations Pending Ruling on Consolidation by Apple Inc. (Ford, Sara)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 8/26/2021. (KEK)
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by M Wesley Smithart on behalf of Apple Inc (Smithart, M)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lana Alcorn Olson on behalf of Apple Inc (Olson, Lana)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey P Doss on behalf of Apple Inc (Doss, Jeffrey)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc. filed by Apple Inc (Ford, Sara)
August 16, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, with Jury Demand by Apple Inc.(Ford, Sara)
July 29, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Candis Posey, Tammy Hudgins, Diane Baldwin, Jeremy Daniel Wofford, Jodi Clements, Edward Timothy Collier, Kim Kendrick, Joan Collett Collier, Rosemary Battles, Mike Herndon, Nathan Small, Elizabeth Thein, Mlissa Mazzeo, Rebecca Burns, Lavenia Diane Fisher, Barbara Richardson, Bridgitte Rogers Blankenship, Brooke Wood, Terry Williams, Phillip Gowens, Michael Boatwright, Anthony Land, Eric Powell, Kathy Glaze, Debbie Duke, Jason Everett, Dennis Jay Farmer, Katara Lane, Andrea Mershon, Steven Battles, Anita Quitoriano, Tangela Butler, Brianna Kruz Smith, Taylor Henry, Carla Jenkins, Larissa Gunnells, Christopher Hill, Jessica Ponder, Leslie Farmer, Toni Ballinger, Stephen Jenkins, Cassandra White, Margaret Limbaugh, Becky Farmer, Brandy Deeann Higdon, Trela Nelson, Tracy Higgins, Karen Vest. Apple Inc served on 7/26/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (MEB2)
July 21, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2)
July 21, 2021 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Diane Baldwin, Toni Ballinger, Rosemary Battles, Steven Battles, Bridgitte Rogers Blankenship, Michael Boatwright, Rebecca Burns, Tangela Butler, Jodi Clements, Edward Timothy Collier, Joan Collett Collier, Debbie Duke, Jason Everett, Becky Farmer, Dennis Jay Farmer, Leslie Farmer, Lavenia Diane Fisher, Kathy Glaze, Phillip Gowens, Larissa Gunnells, Taylor Henry, Mike Herndon, Brandy Deeann Higdon, Tracy Higgins, Christopher Hill, Tammy Hudgins, Carla Jenkins, Stephen Jenkins, Kim Kendrick, Anthony Land, Katara Lane, Margaret Limbaugh, Mlissa Mazzeo, Andrea Mershon, Trela Nelson, Jessica Ponder, Candis Posey, Eric Powell, Anita Quitoriano, Barbara Richardson, Nathan Small, Brianna Kruz Smith, Elizabeth Thein, Karen Vest, Cassandra White, Terry Williams, Jeremy Daniel Wofford, Brooke Wood. (Ware, Dargan)
July 21, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number B4601114744 (MEB2)
July 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc, filed by Candis Posey, Tammy Hudgins, Diane Baldwin, Jeremy Daniel Wofford, Jodi Clements, Edward Timothy Collier, Kim Kendrick, Joan Collett Collier, Rosemary Battles, Mike Herndon, Nathan Small, Elizabeth Thein, Mlissa Mazzeo, Rebecca Burns, Lavenia Diane Fisher, Barbara Richardson, Bridgitte Rogers Blankenship, Brooke Wood, Terry Williams, Phillip Gowens, Michael Boatwright, Anthony Land, Eric Powell, Kathy Glaze, Debbie Duke, Jason Everett, Dennis Jay Farmer, Katara Lane, Andrea Mershon, Steven Battles, Anita Quitoriano, Tangela Butler, Brianna Kruz Smith, Taylor Henry, Carla Jenkins, Larissa Gunnells, Christopher Hill, Jessica Ponder, Leslie Farmer, Toni Ballinger, Stephen Jenkins, Cassandra White, Margaret Limbaugh, Becky Farmer, Brandy Deeann Higdon, Trela Nelson, Tracy Higgins, Karen Vest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(SRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kendrick et al v. Apple Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Kendrick
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianna Kruz Smith
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra White
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Vest
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Quitoriano
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Daniel Wofford
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Jenkins
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Jenkins
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Gowens
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Powell
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Hill
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Mershon
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Richardson
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Ponder
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Herndon
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Timothy Collier
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Collett Collier
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trela Nelson
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgitte Rogers Blankenship
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Baldwin
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Everett
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katara Lane
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Williams
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mlissa Mazzeo
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi Clements
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Thein
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Burns
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Battles
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Battles
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Boatwright
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Hudgins
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candis Posey
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Limbaugh
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Land
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Henry
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Deeann Higdon
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni Ballinger
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tangela Butler
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavenia Diane Fisher
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larissa Gunnells
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Duke
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Higgins
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Small
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky Farmer
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Jay Farmer
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Farmer
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Glaze
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Wood
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Margaret Wesley Smithart
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Represented By: Lana Alcorn Olson
Represented By: Sara Anne Ford
Represented By: M Wesley Smithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?