Giddens v. Hunter et al
Plaintiff: Richard Brandon Giddens
Defendant: John Bernard Hunter and Empire Express Inc
Case Number: 4:2021cv01047
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Plaintiff has filed an unopposed motion to remand (doc. #2 ). The court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion (doc. #2 ) and REMANDS this case to the Circuit Court of St. Clair County, Alabama. Costs are taxed as paid. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 9/2/2021. (KEK)
September 2, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3918001. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by John Bernard Hunter from Circuit Court of St. Clair County, case number 75-CV-2021-900126.00. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(SRD). (Miller, Jeffrey)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 Unopposed MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Richard Brandon Giddens. (Towns, Candace)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by John Bernard Hunter from Circuit Court of St. Clair County, case number 75-CV-2021-900126.00. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(SRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giddens v. Hunter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Brandon Giddens
Represented By: Candace Bartley Towns
Represented By: Jeffrey G Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bernard Hunter
Represented By: Jeffrey G Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Express Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?