Bryant v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Rose Mare Bryant
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2021cv01270
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rose Mare Bryant. Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 10/13/2021, answer due 12/12/2021. (Allenstein, Myron)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General delivered to plaintiff for service (KAM)
September 24, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3931236. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner, filed by Rose Mare Bryant.(KAM). (Allenstein, Myron) NDAL rec# B4601115952 Modified on 9/27/2021 (KAM).
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner, filed by Rose Mare Bryant.(KAM)
September 21, 2021 NOTICE that counsel shall provide the social security number of the plaintiff to the US Attorney's Office within 10 days. This notice is to be made outside of the electronic filing system. (KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Mare Bryant
Represented By: Myron K Allenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?