Jennings v. St. Clair County (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: John Eric Jennings
Defendant: St Clair County
Case Number: 4:2021cv01288
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:21-cv-00570. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: it is ORDERED that: 1) The #3 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED. 2) This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). The Clerk of the court is DIRECTED to undertake those measures necessary to effectuate the transfer of this case. This case is Closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/27/2021. (cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/27/2021.]
September 27, 2021 Case transferred to Northern District of Alabama. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/27/2021.]
September 24, 2021 No objections filed to the #3 Recommendation. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/27/2021.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 3 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Objections to R&R due by 9/17/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 9/2/2021. (cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/27/2021.]
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by John Eric Jennings. (bll, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/27/2021.] Modified on 9/27/2021 (KEK).
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against St. Clair County, filed by John Eric Jennings.(bll, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/27/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jennings v. St. Clair County (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Eric Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Clair County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?