Guntersville Breathables Inc v. Twenty-Six Designs LLC
Plaintiff: Guntersville Breathables Inc
Defendant: Twenty-Six Designs LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv01543
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Opposed Motion to Dismiss by Guntersville Breathables Inc. (Jackson, Joseph)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER re #12 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Enjoin Twenty-Six Designs, LLC from Proceeding with a Duplicative Suit Filed in New Jersey and requesting that the Court Determine Proper Venue Under the First-to-File Rule - Defendant's response is due on or before January 27, 2022; a reply, if any, is due on or before February 3, 2021. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 1/13/22. (SAC)
January 11, 2022 Filing 12 Emergency MOTION PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO ENJOIN TWENTY-SIX DESIGNS, LLC FROM PROCEEDING WITH A DUPLICATIVE SUIT FILED IN NEW JERSEY AND REQUESTING THAT THE COURT DETERMINE PROPER VENUE UNDER THE FIRST-TO-FILE RULE by Guntersville Breathables Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Enjoin, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Browning, Charles)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER - The court GRANTS #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy A. Berman and #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kieran G. Doyle. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 1/10/22. (SAC)
January 10, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kieran G. Doyle by Twenty-Six Designs LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Declaration of Kieran G. Doyle)(Chatterton, Marcus)
January 10, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy A. Berman by Twenty-Six Designs LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Declaration of Jeremy A. Berman)(Chatterton, Marcus)
January 10, 2022 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3991520. (Chatterton, Marcus)
January 10, 2022 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3991506. (Chatterton, Marcus)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER re #7 Defendant's Opposed Motion to Dismiss by Twenty-Six Designs LLC - Plaintiff's response is due on or before January 18, 2022; a reply, if any is due on or before January 25, 2022. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 1/3/22. (SAC)
December 30, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Opposed Motion to Dismiss by Twenty-Six Designs LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Banks, Johnny)
December 22, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Guntersville Breathables Inc. Twenty-Six Designs LLC served on 12/9/2021, answer due 12/30/2021. (KEK)
December 3, 2021 Filing 5 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Twenty-Six Designs LLC. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
December 3, 2021 Filing 4 Request for service by certified mail filed by Guntersville Breathables Inc. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Summons)(Browning, Charles)
December 2, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Twenty-Six Designs LLC. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
December 2, 2021 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Guntersville Breathables Inc. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Summons)(Browning, Charles)
November 19, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3965101. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Twenty-Six Designs LLC, filed by Guntersville Breathables Inc.(KEK). (Browning, Charles)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Twenty-Six Designs LLC, filed by Guntersville Breathables Inc.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guntersville Breathables Inc v. Twenty-Six Designs LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guntersville Breathables Inc
Represented By: Charles Brandon Browning
Represented By: Joseph Walton Jackson, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twenty-Six Designs LLC
Represented By: Marcus R Chatterton
Represented By: Jeremy A Berman
Represented By: Johnny Lewis Banks
Represented By: Kieran G Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?