Green et al v. Omnitrax Inc et al
Plaintiff: Nick Green and Matt Green
Defendant: Omnitrax Inc and Alabama & Tennessee River Railway LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv01636
Filed: December 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2022 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Matt Green, Nick Green. (Adams, Erin)
January 19, 2022 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Alabama & Tennessee River Railway LLC, Omnitrax Inc. (Williams, Turner)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: The court received #9 the plaintiffs' motion to remand. The court sets a briefing schedule as follows: the defendants shall file a response by January 20, 2022, not to exceed 25 pages, double-spaced in 14-point font. Then, the plaintiffs may reply to the defendants' response by January 27, 2022, not to exceed 10 pages, double-spaced in 14-point font. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 1/6/2022. (SRD)
January 5, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Matt Green, Nick Green. (Adams, Erin)
January 5, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by Matt Green, Nick Green. (Adams, Erin)
January 5, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M Mezrano on behalf of Matt Green, Nick Green (Mezrano, Steven)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The court received #5 Defendant Omnitrax Inc.'s motion to dismiss. The court sets a briefing schedule as follows: the plaintiffs shall file a response by January 5, 2022, not to exceed 25 pages, double-spaced in 14-point font. Then, the defendants may reply to the plaintiffs' response by January 12, 2022, not to exceed 10 pages, double-spaced in 14-point font. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 12/15/2021. (SRD)
December 15, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Omnitrax Inc. filed by Omnitrax Inc (Williams, Turner)
December 15, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Omnitrax Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Williams, Turner)
December 13, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3977146 (ALND B4601117429) related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Omnitrax Inc and Alabama & Tennessee River Railway LLC from Circuit Court of Etowah County, case number 31-CV-2021-900523.00. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(SRD). (Williams, Turner) Modified on 12/13/2021 (KEK).
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 12/10/2021. (SRD)
December 10, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alabama & Tennessee River Railway LLC. filed by Alabama & Tennessee River Railway LLC (Williams, Turner)
December 10, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Alabama & Tennessee River Railway LLC.(Williams, Turner)
December 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Omnitrax Inc and Alabama & Tennessee River Railway LLC from Circuit Court of Etowah County, case number 31-CV-2021-900523.00. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(SRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green et al v. Omnitrax Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Green
Represented By: Erin Ganey Adams
Represented By: Steven M Mezrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Green
Represented By: Erin Ganey Adams
Represented By: Steven M Mezrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnitrax Inc
Represented By: Al Foster Teel
Represented By: Madeline E. Hughes
Represented By: Turner B Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama & Tennessee River Railway LLC
Represented By: Al Foster Teel
Represented By: Madeline E. Hughes
Represented By: Turner B Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?