McCoy v. Attorney General of the State of Alabama et al
Petitioner: Randal B McCoy
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Alabama and Warden
Case Number: 4:2022cv01191
Filed: September 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED; If he wishes to continue this action, the petitioner is ORDERED to forward to the Clerk of Court a check or money order in the amount of $5 made payable to the Clerk, United States District Court within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 10/31/2022. (KAM)
October 27, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION (Application) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Randal B McCoy. (KSS)
October 27, 2022 Filing 4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Randal B McCoy.(KSS)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER The petitioner filed a petition for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 2254 (doc #1 ). The petition is deficient for the following reasons as set out in the order. The petitioner must correct the deficiency within 30 days. If he does not correct the deficiency by this deadline, the court may dismiss this action for want of prosecution without further notice under FRCP 41(b). The Clerk is DIRECTED to serve a copy of the form for habeas actions and the form application to proceed in forma pauperis on the petitioner along with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 10/11/2022. (KSS)
September 19, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE to petitioner regarding case number. (LMW)
September 19, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Attorney General of the State of Alabama, Warden, filed by Randal B McCoy.(LMW) Modified, incorrectly filed as COMPLAINT, on 9/19/2022 (LMW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy v. Attorney General of the State of Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Randal B McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?