ERS LLC v. Daniels Sharpsmart LLC
Plaintiff: ERS LLC
Defendant: Daniels Sharpsmart LLC
Case Number: 4:2023cv00051
Filed: January 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Brown, T)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ERS LLC. filed by ERS LLC (Sullivan, Joshua)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER - Before the court is the parties Joint Motion for a Telephonic Rule 26 Conference #6 . The Motion #6 is GRANTED.. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/13/2023. (KAM)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Hearing Telephonic Rule 26 Conference by Daniels Sharpsmart LLC. (Brown, T)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph B. Kerstiens on behalf of Daniels Sharpsmart LLC (Kerstiens, Joseph)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/17/2023. (KAM)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Daniels Sharpsmart LLC. filed by Daniels Sharpsmart LLC (Brown, T)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Daniels Sharpsmart LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brown, T)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number B-3205 (KAM)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against ERS LLC, filed by Daniels Sharpsmart LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ERS LLC v. Daniels Sharpsmart LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERS LLC
Represented By: Joshua Blake Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniels Sharpsmart LLC
Represented By: T Michael Brown
Represented By: Joseph B. Kerstiens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?