Williams v. Page
Plaintiff: Bradley Edward Williams
Defendant: Thomas Page
Case Number: 4:2024cv01694
Filed: December 9, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Mr. Williams is ORDERED to pay an initial partial filing fee of $29.83 within 14 days from the entry date of this order. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this action without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 2/6/2025. (CLC)
January 17, 2025 Filing 6 Prisoner Consent Form by Bradley Edward Williams (CLC)
January 17, 2025 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The undersigned RECOMMENDS the court DISMISS this action WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) based on Mr. Williams' failure to prosecute his claims. Any objections must be filed with the Clerk of Court within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 1/17/2025. (CLC)
December 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The plaintiff has filed an application to proceed in forma pauperis and a certified copy of his jail or prison account statements. (Doc. #2 ). It is ORDERED that the application is GRANTED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). The plaintiff has received in his account average monthly deposits of $149.16 and had an average account balance of $0.26 for the last six months. The court therefore assesses an initial partial filing fee of $29.83 under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). If he wishes to continue this action, the plaintiff is ORDERED to sign the attached Prisoner Consent Form and return it to the Clerk of Court, together with a check in the amount of the initial partial filing fee made payable to the "Clerk, United States District Court" within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 12/10/2024. (CLC)
December 10, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of civil action number. (CLC)
December 9, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bradley Edward Williams. (CLC)
December 9, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas Page, filed by Bradley Edward Williams.(CLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?