Alabama Education Association et al v. Bentley et al

Plaintiff: Alabama Education Association, A-Vote, Pam Hill, Jeff Breece, Chassity Smith, Cathey McNeal, Dorothy J. Strickland and Ronald Slaughter
Defendant: Freida Hill, Madison County Board of Education, Robert L. Broussard, Thomas L. White, Jr., Huntsville City Board of Education, City of Madison Board of Education, Robert T. Treese, III, Robert Bentley, Joseph B. Morton and David Perry
Intervenor_plaintiff: PEBCO, Inc and ASEA
Case Number: 5:2011cv00761
Filed: February 24, 2011
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Northeastern Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: C Lynwood Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2013 159 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER that this court's order directing the Officials to provide full and complete responses to the subpoenas by 2/1/2013, should be interpreted as meaning that the Officials must respond to the subpoenas by 2/1/2013, and that they cannot supplement their assertions of privilege, including of the attorney-client and work product privileges, by the February 1st deadline, as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 1/23/2013. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-00761-CLS, 5:11-cv-01054-CLS(AHI)
January 22, 2013 157 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that this court's order denying the Officials' motions to quash should be construed as meaning that movants cannot now submit privilege logs, affidavits, and similar materials supporting their claims of privileg e on the February 1, 2013 deadline for production of documents in response to plaintiffs' subpoenas and the Motions to Stay are DENIED as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 1/22/2013. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-00761-CLS, 5:11-cv-01054-CLS(AHI) Modified on 1/22/2013 (AHI).
January 3, 2013 148 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER; it is ordered that the motions to quash be denied as more fully set out in order; it is further ordered that AL Governor Robert J. Bentley, former AL Governor Robert R. Riley, AL Senate President Pro Tempore Del Marsh, and Speaker of the House of Representatives Mike Hubbard provide full and complete responses to the subpeonas duces tecum served upon each of them on or before Friday, Febuary 1, 2013. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 01/03/13. (SPT )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alabama Education Association et al v. Bentley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freida Hill
Represented By: James W Davis
Represented By: Margaret L Fleming
Represented By: William G Parker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison County Board of Education
Represented By: J R Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Broussard
Represented By: Julian D Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas L. White, Jr.
Represented By: Algert S Agricola, Jr
Represented By: Albert L Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntsville City Board of Education
Represented By: J R Brooks
Represented By: Taylor P Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Madison Board of Education
Represented By: J R Brooks
Represented By: William W Sanderson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert T. Treese, III
Represented By: James W Davis
Represented By: Margaret L Fleming
Represented By: William G Parker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bentley
Represented By: Algert S Agricola, Jr
Represented By: Albert L Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph B. Morton
Represented By: James W Davis
Represented By: Margaret L Fleming
Represented By: William G Parker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Perry
Represented By: Algert S Agricola, Jr
Represented By: Albert L Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: PEBCO, Inc
Represented By: J Mark White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: ASEA
Represented By: J Mark White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alabama Education Association
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Represented By: Edward Still
Represented By: Gregory B Stein
Represented By: Robert D Segall
Represented By: Alice O'Brien
Represented By: Philip A Hostak
Represented By: Samuel H Heldman
Represented By: J Cecil Gardner
Represented By: Annary A Cheatham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A-Vote
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Represented By: Edward Still
Represented By: Gregory B Stein
Represented By: Robert D Segall
Represented By: Alice O'Brien
Represented By: Philip A Hostak
Represented By: Samuel H Heldman
Represented By: J Cecil Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pam Hill
Represented By: J Cecil Gardner
Represented By: Samuel H Heldman
Represented By: Philip A Hostak
Represented By: Alice O'Brien
Represented By: Robert D Segall
Represented By: Gregory B Stein
Represented By: Edward Still
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Breece
Represented By: J Cecil Gardner
Represented By: Samuel H Heldman
Represented By: Philip A Hostak
Represented By: Alice O'Brien
Represented By: Robert D Segall
Represented By: Gregory B Stein
Represented By: Edward Still
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chassity Smith
Represented By: J Cecil Gardner
Represented By: Samuel H Heldman
Represented By: Philip A Hostak
Represented By: Alice O'Brien
Represented By: Robert D Segall
Represented By: Gregory B Stein
Represented By: Edward Still
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathey McNeal
Represented By: J Cecil Gardner
Represented By: Samuel H Heldman
Represented By: Philip A Hostak
Represented By: Alice O'Brien
Represented By: Robert D Segall
Represented By: Gregory B Stein
Represented By: Edward Still
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy J. Strickland
Represented By: J Cecil Gardner
Represented By: Samuel H Heldman
Represented By: Philip A Hostak
Represented By: Alice O'Brien
Represented By: Robert D Segall
Represented By: Gregory B Stein
Represented By: Edward Still
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Slaughter
Represented By: J Cecil Gardner
Represented By: Samuel H Heldman
Represented By: Philip A Hostak
Represented By: Alice O'Brien
Represented By: Robert D Segall
Represented By: Gregory B Stein
Represented By: Edward Still
Represented By: Herman Watson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?