Weaver v. Madison City Board of Education et al

Plaintiff: Michael E Weaver
Defendant: Madison City Board of Education and Dee Fowler
Case Number: 5:2011cv03558
Filed: October 4, 2011
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Northeastern Office
County: Limestone
Presiding Judge: T Michael Putnam
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2016 158 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 12/13/16. (MRR, )
December 23, 2015 119 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 12/23/15. (MRR, )
August 14, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 17 MOTION to Dismiss. All Objections to the Report and Recommendation are OVERRULED. The Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is hereby ACCEPTED and his Recommendation is ADOPTED as the Opinion of this Court. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 8/14/2013. (JLC)
May 29, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by US Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/28/2013. (KAM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weaver v. Madison City Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E Weaver
Represented By: Edward Still
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison City Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dee Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?