Shi v. Alabama A&M University, et al.

Plaintiff: Xingzhong Shi
Defendant: Alabama A&M University, Trent Montgomery, Denial Wims and Andrew Hugine
Case Number: 5:2013mc00327
Filed: February 19, 2013
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Northeastern Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: C Lynwood Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2015 119 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/28/2015. (KEK)
November 21, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, as set out. Plaintiff's motions 1, 2, 4, 5, and 7 are DENIED, and his motions 3 and 6 are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Specifically, Defendants have fourteen (14) days from the date of this order to respon d to Interrogatories 6, 11, and 12 of the May 2014 Interrogatories and to the interrogatories instead of depositions set out in Section II.B. Plaintiff's three separately numbered motions/requests are also DENIED. Except for the above-ordered responses, discovery is CLOSED. The parties have thirty (30) days from the date the responses are due to file any dispositive motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 11/21/14. (CTS, )
July 15, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that it is ORDERED that plaintiff's response to defendants' motion to dismiss be construed as a motion for leave to further amend his Amended Complaint and, as so construed, it is GRANTED; Defendants' motio n to dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; Plaintiff's Claim 3, asserted solely against the University Grievance Committee of A & M, is DISMISSED; Any portions of Claim 6 that assert § 1983 claims against the Board of Trustees as a n entity also are DISMISSED; Finally, all § 1983 claims against the individual defendants, Trent Montgomery, Daniel Wims, and Andrew Hugine, in their respective official capacities are DISMISSED as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 7/15/2013. (AHI )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shi v. Alabama A&M University, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xingzhong Shi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama A&M University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trent Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denial Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Hugine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?