United States of America v. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Currency
Claimant: Mark A. Murphy, M.D. and Jennifer Murphy
Case Number: 5:2018cv01181
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Northeastern Office
County: Limestone
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that the #18 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV for Edward M. Yarbrough and #17 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV for W. Justin Adams are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 9/13/2018. (AHI)
September 5, 2018 Filing 19 CLAIM Verified Claim and Statement of Interest or Right of Mark A. Murphy, M.D. Against Defendants Properties by Mark A. Murphy, M.D.. (Burgess, C)
September 5, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3166922 (B4601091754) (Burgess, C)
September 5, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3166918 (B4601091753) (Burgess, C)
September 5, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Edward M. Yarbrough by Mark A. Murphy, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Burgess, C)
September 5, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of W. Justin Adams by Mark A. Murphy, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Burgess, C)
September 5, 2018 Filing 16 CLAIM civil forfeiture by Currency(Approximately $1,058,153.78 worth of equities, annuities and other investment vehicles contained in BB&T Account Number-5508 Held in the name of Mark Murphy with designated beneficiary, Jennifer Murphy). (Hardin, Hal)
September 5, 2018 Filing 15 CLAIM civil forfeiture by Currency(Approximately $380,723.35 worth of equities, annuities and other investment vehicles contained in BB&T Account Number-2106 held in the name of Jennifer Murphy with designated beneficiary, Mark Murphy). (Hardin, Hal)
August 28, 2018 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE by United States of America re #9 Warrant Issued (Grosnoff, Nicole)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that the Court GRANTS #11 #12 Motions for Leave to Appear PHV for Cynthia Chappell and Hal Hardin. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 8/24/2018. (AHI)
August 21, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3156520 (B4601091457). (Penhale, Ashley)
August 21, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3156516 (B4601091456). (Penhale, Ashley)
August 21, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Cynthia Chappell by Currency(Approximately $380,723.35 worth of equities, annuities and other investment vehicles contained in BB&T Account Number-2106 held in the name of Jennifer Murphy with designated beneficiary, Mark Murphy). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Cynthia Chappell)(Penhale, Ashley)
August 21, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Hal Hardin by Currency(Approximately $380,723.35 worth of equities, annuities and other investment vehicles contained in BB&T Account Number-2106 held in the name of Jennifer Murphy with designated beneficiary, Mark Murphy). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Hal Hardin)(Penhale, Ashley)
August 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Nicole Penhale on behalf of Currency(Approximately $380,723.35 worth of equities, annuities and other investment vehicles contained in BB&T Account Number-2106 held in the name of Jennifer Murphy with designated beneficiary, Mark Murphy) (Penhale, Ashley)
August 14, 2018 Filing 9 WARRANT of of Arrest in Rem issued by Judge Kallon and del to parties electronically (AHI)
August 2, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture to Jennifer Murphy, c/o Hal Hardin (Grosnoff, Nicole)
August 2, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture to Dr. Mark Murphy, c/o Ed Yarbrough (Grosnoff, Nicole)
August 2, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture to Jennifer Murphy (Grosnoff, Nicole)
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture to Dr. Mark Murphy (Grosnoff, Nicole)
July 30, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Currency(Approximately $1,058,153.78 worth of equities, annuities and other investment vehicles contained in BB&T Account Number-5508 Held in the name of Mark Murphy with designated beneficiary, Jennifer Murphy), Currency(Approximately $380,723.35 worth of equities, annuities and other investment vehicles contained in BB&T Account Number-2106 held in the name of Jennifer Murphy with designated beneficiary, Mark Murphy), filed by United States of America.(Grosnoff, Nicole)
July 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint Application for Warrant of Arrest in Rem (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grosnoff, Nicole)
July 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding case assigned to unassigned judge; this case has been referred to Judge Kallon until further notice. Please use case number 5:18-CV-1811-UJH-AKK on all subsequent pleadings (AHI)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against Currency, et al., filed by United States of America.(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jay E Town
Represented By: Nicole Grosnoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Mark A. Murphy, M.D.
Represented By: Edward Meacham Yarbrough
Represented By: Walter Justin Adams
Represented By: C Gregory Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jennifer Murphy
Represented By: Hal Hardin
Represented By: Ashley Nicole Penhale
Represented By: Cynthia Chappell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?