Martinson et al v. Crete Carrier Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Gerald Paulk, Douglas C. Martinson, II and Deborah Posey
Defendant: Luis Alfonso Castilleja and Crete Carrier Corporation
Case Number: 5:2018cv01467
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Referring Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 10/26/2018. (AHI)
October 17, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - This case is being reassigned from Judge Coogler to Judge Liles Burke. Please use case number 5:18-CV-1467-LCB on all subsequent pleadings (AHI)
October 9, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crete Carrier Corporation. filed by Crete Carrier Corporation (Oliver, Thomas)
October 5, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Luis Alfonso Castilleja.(Oliver, Thomas)
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Crete Carrier Corporation.(Oliver, Thomas)
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Luis Alfonso Castilleja served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/8/2018. (AHI)
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Crete Carrier Corporation served on 9/14/2018, answer due 10/5/2018. (AHI)
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered via certified mail for service as to Luis Alfonso Castilleja and Crete Carrier Corporation. (AHI)
September 10, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3169017 (B4601091866). related document #1 COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against Luis Alfonso Castilleja and Crete Carrier Corporation filed by Douglas C. Martinson, II, Gerald Paulk, and Deborah Posey.(AHI ). (Conchin, Gary) Modified on 9/11/2018 (AHI).
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding case assigned to unassigned judge; this case has been referred to Judge Coogler until further notice. Please use case number 5:18-CV-1467-UJH-LSC on all subsequent pleadings (AHI)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail for Luis Alfonso Castilleja filed by Douglas C. Martinson, II, Gerald Paulk, and Deborah Posey. (AHI)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail for Crete Carrier Corporation filed by Douglas C. Martinson, II, Gerald Paulk, and Deborah Posey. (AHI )
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against Luis Alfonso Castilleja and Crete Carrier Corporation filed by Douglas C. Martinson, II, Gerald Paulk, and Deborah Posey.(AHI )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinson et al v. Crete Carrier Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Paulk
Represented By: Gary V Conchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas C. Martinson, II
Represented By: Gary V Conchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Posey
Represented By: Josh J Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Alfonso Castilleja
Represented By: Thomas L Oliver, II
Represented By: Jordan D Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crete Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Thomas L Oliver, II
Represented By: Jordan D Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?