Brewer v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Dickie Brewer
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2018cv01549
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner by Clerk and delivered to Plaintiff for service. (BJL)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Darryl W Hunt on behalf of Dickie Brewer (Hunt, Darryl)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Karl E. Osterhout. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/25/18. (LBG, )
October 25, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3203713 (receipt number B4601092965). (Osterhout, Karl) Modified on 10/26/2018 (BJL).
October 25, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3203619 (receipt number B4601092964). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner, filed by Dickie Brewer.(BJL). (Osterhout, Karl) Modified on 10/26/2018 (BJL).
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of case assignment to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion is RIPE 9/21/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Dickie Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Consent)(BJL)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner, filed by Dickie Brewer.(BJL)
September 21, 2018 NOTICE that counsel for the plaintiff is required to provide the social security number of the plaintiff to the US Attorney's Office within 10 days. The notice is to be given to the US Attorney outside of the electronic filing system. (BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dickie Brewer
Represented By: Karl E Osterhout
Represented By: Darryl W Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?