Breaking Free LLC et al v. JCG Foods of Alabama LLC et al
Plaintiff: Connie Buttram and Breaking Free LLC
Defendant: Koch Meat Co Inc, JCG Foods of Alabama LLC and Koch Foods Inc
Case Number: 5:2018cv01659
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:181
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Koch Meat Co Inc. filed by Koch Meat Co Inc (Garrison, Kevin)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that the plaintiffs are to file any response to the motion for partial dismissal within 14 days from the entry date of this order; defendant shall file any reply within 7 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 12/3/2018. (AHI)
November 30, 2018 Filing 27 REPLY to re #11 JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC and Koch Foods, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss filed by JCG Foods of Alabama LLC, Koch Foods Inc. (Garrison, Kevin)
November 29, 2018 Filing 26 Brief re #25 MOTION to Dismiss Koch Meat Co., Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Koch Meat Co., Inc.'s Memorandum of Authorities in Support of its Motion to Dismiss filed by Koch Meat Co Inc. (Garrison, Kevin)
November 29, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Koch Meat Co., Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss by Koch Meat Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Garrison, Kevin)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER granting #23 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file their reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by November 30, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/20/2018. (LMC, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Unopposed Motion is RIPE 11/20/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by JCG Foods of Alabama LLC, Koch Foods Inc. (Garrison, Kevin)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting #20 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Enlarge Page Limits for Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The court acknowledges that Plaintiffs have filed their brief, noted as Doc. 21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/20/2018. (LMC, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC and Koch Foods, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss filed by Breaking Free LLC, Connie Buttram. (McKinney, Rebekah)
November 19, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION Enlarge Page Limits by Breaking Free LLC, Connie Buttram. (McKinney, Rebekah)
November 6, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Breaking Free LLC and Connie Buttram for Koch Meat Co, Inc with no date of delivery given. (BJL)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by no later than December 17, 2018, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes.Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/5/18. (BJL)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER setting Telephone Conference for 12/3/2018 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/5/18. (BJL)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26 as more fully set out therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/5/18. (BJL)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #11 MOTION to Dismiss JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC and Koch Foods, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. The court ORDERS Plaintiffs to file any response to the motion within fourteen (14) days from the entry date of this order. Defendant shall file any reply within seven (7) days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/5/18. (BJL)
November 2, 2018 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JCG Foods of Alabama LLC. filed by JCG Foods of Alabama LLC (Garrison, Kevin)
November 2, 2018 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Koch Foods Inc. filed by Koch Foods Inc (Garrison, Kevin)
November 2, 2018 Filing 12 Brief re #11 MOTION to Dismiss JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC and Koch Foods, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC and Koch Foods, Inc.'s Memorandum of Authorities in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss filed by JCG Foods of Alabama LLC, Koch Foods Inc. (Garrison, Kevin)
November 2, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC and Koch Foods, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss by JCG Foods of Alabama LLC, Koch Foods Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Garrison, Kevin)
October 23, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Breaking Free LLC, Connie Buttram. Koch Foods Inc served on 10/15/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (BJL)
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Breaking Free LLC, Connie Buttram. JCG Foods of Alabama LLC served on 10/12/2018, answer due 11/2/2018. (BJL)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vic, as the court has granted Mr. Butler's amended application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/15/2018. (LMC, )
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave for J. Dudley Butler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/15/2018. (LMC, )
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion is RIPE 10/15/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Breaking Free LLC, Connie Buttram. (McKinney, Rebekah)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to JCG Foods of Alabama LLC, Koch Foods Inc, and Koch Meat Co Inc by Clerk for service by certified mail. (BJL)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of case assignment to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Breaking Free LLC and Connie Buttram. (BJL)
October 9, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $50, manual receipt number 226415, receipt number H4601003733. (BJL) Modified on 10/10/2018 (BJL, ).
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Allow J. Dudley Butler to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion is RIPE 10/9/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Breaking Free LLC, Connie Buttram. (BJL)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against JCG Foods of Alabama LLC, Koch Foods Inc, and Koch Meat Co Inc (Filing fee $ 400.00, manual receipt number: 226414, receipt number: H4601003732) filed by Breaking Free LLC, Connie Buttram.(BJL) Modified on 10/10/2018 (BJL, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breaking Free LLC et al v. JCG Foods of Alabama LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Buttram
Represented By: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breaking Free LLC
Represented By: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koch Meat Co Inc
Represented By: Kevin R Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JCG Foods of Alabama LLC
Represented By: Daisy Christina Karlson
Represented By: Kevin R Garrison
Represented By: Scott W Pedigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koch Foods Inc
Represented By: Daisy Christina Karlson
Represented By: Kevin R Garrison
Represented By: Scott W Pedigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?