Cope v. Tower Loans and Gulfco et al
Plaintiff: Frances Denise Cope
Defendant: Alabama State Banking Commission, Tower Loans and Gulfco and Alabama Department of Insurance
Case Number: 5:2018cv01861
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE that the motion to dismiss is GRANTED and this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 12/7/2018. (AHI)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss case without prejudice by Frances Denise Cope. (AHI)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the plaintiff has until 12/5/2018 to file an application to proceed IFP as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 11/30/2018 #1 IFP Form) (AHI)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Frances Denise Cope. (AHI)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; plaintiff is to file an exact dollar amount and a complete application by 11/28/2018,as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 11/13/2018. (AHI)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Frances Denise Cope. (AHI)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against Alabama Department of Insurance, Alabama State Banking Commission, and Tower Loans and Gulfco filed by Frances Denise Cope.(AHI )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cope v. Tower Loans and Gulfco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama State Banking Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tower Loans and Gulfco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Denise Cope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?