Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. William's Barbecue Inc et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: William A Acker and William's Barbecue Inc
Case Number: 5:2018cv01925
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Attorney for all Defendants on 12/11/2018 by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Waiver of Service due by 1/10/2019. (Gamble, F.)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. William's Barbecue Inc waiver sent on 12/11/2018, answer due 2/09/2019. (Gamble, F.) Modified on 1/14/2019 (AHI).
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc (Gamble, F.)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to William A Acker and William's Barbecue Inc by Clerk and delivered to Plaintiff for service. (SPT )
November 23, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3223145 (B4601093642). related document #1 COMPLAINT against William A Acker and William's Barbecue Inc filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc.(AHI). (Gamble, F.) Modified on 11/27/2018 (AHI).
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William A Acker and William's Barbecue Inc filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc.(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. William's Barbecue Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: F. Page Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William A Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William's Barbecue Inc
Represented By: Robert Champ Crocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?