Matanane v. Gentry

Petitioner: Leigh Ann Matanane
Respondent: Matt Gentry
Case Number: 5:2019cv00051
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
0 Judge: Karon O Bowdre
1 Judge: T Michael Putnam
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Leigh Ann Matanane, through counsel, filed a Motion to Dismiss her habeas petition brought pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. (Doc. 8). The court GRANTS that motion and DISMISSES this action WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/4/2019. (KEK)
February 1, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION to Dismiss by Leigh Ann Matanane. (Drake, Thomas)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Petitioner is hereby ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing, within fourteen (14) calendar days of the date of this Order, why her claim should not be dismissed as unexhausted. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 1/30/2019. (JLC)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Starrett on behalf of Matt Gentry (Starrett, Marc)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING #4 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 1/28/2019. (JLC)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Leigh Ann Matanane. (Drake, Thomas)
January 17, 2019 Filing Fee received for Leigh Ann Matanane in the amount of $5.00, receipt number B4601094817. (JLC)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Shelby Garrett Acknowledgement filed by Leigh Ann Matanane. (Drake, Thomas)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING; Petitioner's pleading is deficient for the reasons indicated. Petitioner must correct the deficient pleading within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this Order in the manner explained herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 1/10/2019. (JLC)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Leigh Ann Matanane.(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matanane v. Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matt Gentry
Represented By: Marc Starrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leigh Ann Matanane
Represented By: Thomas E Drake, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?