Ledlow v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner

Plaintiff: Reta McSpadden Ledlow
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2019cv00092
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute a more fully set out therein. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 2/26/2019. (AHI)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that plaintiff is to show cause by 2/19/2019 why her case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 2/12/2019. (AHI )
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED and plaintiff has until 2/8/2019 to pay the required filing fee, failing which this case may be dismissed without prejudice as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 1/25/2019. (AHI)
January 16, 2019 NOTICE that counsel for the plaintiff is required to provide the social security number of the plaintiff to the US Attorney's Office within 10 days. The notice is to be given to the US Attorney outside of the electronic filing system. (AHI)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Reta McSpadden Ledlow. (AHI)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Reta McSpadden Ledlow. (AHI)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner filed by Reta McSpadden Ledlow.(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledlow v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reta McSpadden Ledlow
Represented By: Nicholas H Gajewski
Represented By: James William Ezzell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?