Pukis et al v. Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services et al
Plaintiff: Blossomwood Medical PC, MD Vytautas Pukis and Vytautas Pukis
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services the, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services and Alex M Azar, II
Case Number: 5:2019cv00232
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act / Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vytautas Pukis, Blossomwood Medical PC. Alex M Azar, II served on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/20/2019. (Steakley, Roderic)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE Return of Service of U.S. Dept of Justice c/o Matthew Whitaker, Acting Attorney General (Coffey, Fred) Modified on 2/21/2019 (AFS).
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vytautas Pukis, Blossomwood Medical PC. United States Department of Health and Human Services the served on 2/13/2019, answer due 4/14/2019. (Coffey, Fred)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vytautas Pukis, Blossomwood Medical PC. Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services served on 2/12/2019, answer due 4/13/2019. (Coffey, Fred)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Alex M Azar, II, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, United States Department of Health and Human Services the., Summons Issued as to Alex M Azar, II, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, United States Department of Health and Human Services the, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (AFS)
February 8, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $400.00, (ALND receipt # B4601095288)receipt_number 1126-3274803. related document #1 COMPLAINT for Judicial Review against Alex M Azar, II, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, United States Department of Health and Human Services the, filed by Vytautas Pukis, Blossomwood Medical PC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(AFS). (Steakley, Roderic) Modified on 2/8/2019 (AFS).
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Judicial Review against Alex M Azar, II, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, United States Department of Health and Human Services the, filed by Vytautas Pukis, Blossomwood Medical PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pukis et al v. Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blossomwood Medical PC
Represented By: Fred L Coffey, Jr
Represented By: Roderic G Steakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MD Vytautas Pukis
Represented By: Fred L Coffey, Jr
Represented By: Roderic G Steakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vytautas Pukis
Represented By: Fred L Coffey, Jr
Represented By: Roderic G Steakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services the
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?