Nance v. The Health Care Authority of the City of Huntsville d/b/a Huntsville Hospital

Plaintiff: Tiara Nance
Defendant: The Health Care Authority of the City of Huntsville d/b/a Huntsville Hospital
Case Number: 5:2019cv00351
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Referring Judge: C Lynwood Smith
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 4/22/2019. (AHI)
April 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable C. Lynwood Smith, Jr.. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 5:19-cv-351-CLS on all subsequent pleadings. (BJL)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than May 30, 2019, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 4/16/19. (BJL)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting Telephone Conference for 5/15/2019 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 4/16/19. (BJL)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26 as more fully set out therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 4/16/19. (BJL)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Health Care Authority of the City of Huntsville d/b/a Huntsville Hospital.(Barlotta, Rachel)
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tiara Nance. The Health Care Authority of the City of Huntsville d/b/a Huntsville Hospital served on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Auffenorde, Michael)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued by he clerk and delivered to plaintiff for service as to The Health Care Authority of the City of Huntsville d/b/a Huntsville Hospital. (AHI)
March 5, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3293750 (receipt number B4601095869). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against The Health Care Authority of the City of Huntsville d/b/a Huntsville Hospital filed by Tiara Nance. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(BJL). (Auffenorde, Michael) Modified on 3/7/2019 (BJL).
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against The Health Care Authority of the City of Huntsville d/b/a Huntsville Hospital filed by Tiara Nance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nance v. The Health Care Authority of the City of Huntsville d/b/a Huntsville Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Health Care Authority of the City of Huntsville d/b/a Huntsville Hospital
Represented By: Rachel V Barlotta
Represented By: Sharonda Childs Fancher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiara Nance
Represented By: Michael E Auffenorde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?