Perry v. AQuate Corporation
Plaintiff: Amber Perry
Defendant: AQuate Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv00467
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to #8 Order "FORWARD TIME EXPIRED RETURN TO SENDER" (AHI)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the defendant is ORDERED to show cause within 30 days as to why it has failed to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 8/8/2019 as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 7/9/2019. (AHI )
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for show cause order regarding a default judgment by Amber Perry. (Winston, Lee)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed AQuate Corporation served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/27/2019. (AHI)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered via certified mail for service as to AQuate Corporation. (AHI)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 Request for service by certified mail filed by Amber Perry. (Winston, Lee)
April 5, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3318091 (B4601096637). related document #1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against AQuate Corporation filed by Amber Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(AHI). (Winston, Lee)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED and plaintiff has until 4/5/2019 to pay the required filing as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 3/28/2019. (AHI)
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Amber Perry. (Winston, Lee)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against AQuate Corporation filed by Amber Perry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. AQuate Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AQuate Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Perry
Represented By: Lee David Winston
Represented By: Roderick T Cooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?