Broadcast Music Inc et al v. Maggie Myers Inc d/b/a Maggie Meyers Irish Pub et al
Plaintiff: Paul Simon Music, Songs of Universal Inc, Tokeco Tunes, Embassy Music Corporation, Southfield Road Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Fake and Jaded Music, Warner-Tamberlane Publishing Corp, Mad Mother Music, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc, Less Than Zero Music, 4U2asky Entertainment Inc, Escatawpa Songs LLC, R and R Nomad Publishing Company, Broadcast Music Inc and Universal-Songs of Polygram International Inc
Defendant: Maggie Myers Inc d/b/a Maggie Meyers Irish Pub and Cassandra Lynne Smith
Case Number: 5:2019cv00479
Filed: March 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Maggie Myers Inc d/b/a Maggie Meyers Irish Pub and Cassandra Lynne Smith. (BJL)
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Entry of Default Motion is RIPE 7/1/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by 4U2asky Entertainment Inc, Broadcast Music Inc, Embassy Music Corporation, Escatawpa Songs LLC, Fake and Jaded Music, Less Than Zero Music, Mad Mother Music, Paul Simon Music, R and R Nomad Publishing Company, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc, Songs of Universal Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Southfield Road Music, Tokeco Tunes, Universal-Songs of Polygram International Inc, Warner-Tamberlane Publishing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of James P Pewitt)(Pewitt, James) Modified on 7/2/2019 (BJL).
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT by 4U2asky Entertainment Inc, Broadcast Music Inc, Embassy Music Corporation, Escatawpa Songs LLC, Fake and Jaded Music, Less Than Zero Music, Mad Mother Music, Paul Simon Music, R and R Nomad Publishing Company, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc, Songs of Universal Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Southfield Road Music, Tokeco Tunes, Universal-Songs of Polygram International Inc, Warner-Tamberlane Publishing Corp. filed by 4U2asky Entertainment Inc, Broadcast Music Inc, Embassy Music Corporation, Escatawpa Songs LLC, Fake and Jaded Music, Less Than Zero Music, Mad Mother Music, Paul Simon Music, R and R Nomad Publishing Company, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc, Songs of Universal Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Southfield Road Music, Tokeco Tunes, Universal-Songs of Polygram International Inc, Warner-Tamberlane Publishing Corp (Pewitt, James)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: To date, neither Defendant has filed an answer, and Plaintiffs have taken no action. The court therefore ORDERS Plaintiffs to file a status report or take other appropriate action within seven (7) days from the entry date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/18/19. (BJL)
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Maggie Myers Inc d/b/a Maggie Meyers Irish Pub served on 5/18/2019, answer due 6/8/2019; Cassandra Lynne Smith served on 5/18/2019, answer due 6/8/2019. (BJL)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 Alias Summons Issued as to Maggie Myers Inc d/b/a Maggie Meyers Irish Pub and Cassandra Lynne Smith by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL)
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Cassandra Lynne Smith. Service attempted - "Return to Sender". (BJL)
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Maggie Myers Inc d/b/a Maggie Meyers Irish Pub. Service attempted - "Return to Sender". (BJL)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Maggie Myers Inc d/b/a Maggie Meyers Irish Pub and Cassandra Lynne Smith by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL)
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 Request for service by certified mail filed by 4U2asky Entertainment Inc, Broadcast Music Inc, Embassy Music Corporation, Escatawpa Songs LLC, Fake and Jaded Music, Less Than Zero Music, Mad Mother Music, Paul Simon Music, R and R Nomad Publishing Company, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc, Songs of Universal Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Southfield Road Music, Tokeco Tunes, Universal-Songs of Polygram International Inc, and Warner-Tamberlane Publishing Corp. (BJL)
March 27, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601096336 (BJL)
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
March 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of DISCLOSURE STATMENT by 4U2asky Entertainment Inc, Broadcast Music Inc, Embassy Music Corporation, Escatawpa Songs LLC, Fake and Jaded Music, Less Than Zero Music, Mad Mother Music, Paul Simon Music, R and R Nomad Publishing Company, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc, Songs of Universal Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Southfield Road Music, Tokeco Tunes, Universal-Songs of Polygram International Inc, and Warner-Tamberlane Publishing Corp. (BJL)
March 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Maggie Myers Inc d/b/a Maggie Meyers Irish Pub and Cassandra Lynne Smith filed by Embassy Music Corporation, Escatawpa Songs LLC, Fake and Jaded Music, Tokeco Tunes, Broadcast Music Inc, Warner-Tamberlane Publishing Corp, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc, R and R Nomad Publishing Company, Mad Mother Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Less Than Zero Music, Paul Simon Music, Universal-Songs of Polygram International Inc, Songs of Universal Inc, 4U2asky Entertainment Inc, and Southfield Road Music.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music Inc et al v. Maggie Myers Inc d/b/a Maggie Meyers Irish Pub et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Simon Music
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal Inc
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tokeco Tunes
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Embassy Music Corporation
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southfield Road Music
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fake and Jaded Music
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamberlane Publishing Corp
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mad Mother Music
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Less Than Zero Music
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 4U2asky Entertainment Inc
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Escatawpa Songs LLC
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R and R Nomad Publishing Company
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music Inc
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal-Songs of Polygram International Inc
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maggie Myers Inc d/b/a Maggie Meyers Irish Pub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassandra Lynne Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?