Bozeman v. Centricity LLC
Plaintiff: Ricky Bozeman
Defendant: Centricity LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00487
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 06/04/19. (SPT )
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER setting motion deadline #5 Motion to Dismiss. The plaintiff has until May 16, 2019, to file a response and any reply shall be filed no later than May 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 4/25/2019. (KBW)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Centricity LLC. (McLeod, Aaron)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Centricity LLC served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. (AHI)
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered via certified mail for service as to Centricity LLC. (AHI)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Ricky Bozeman. (AHI)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against Centricity LLC (Filing fee $ 400; Receipt Number: H4601003990) filed by Ricky Bozeman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bozeman v. Centricity LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centricity LLC
Represented By: Stephen A Rowe
Represented By: Aaron G McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Bozeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?