Eason v. Huntsville Housing Authority

Plaintiff: Dennis Eason
Defendant: Huntsville Housing Authority
Case Number: 5:2019cv00515
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that the #9 Motion for Huntsville Housing Authority Evictions base on Drug Charges is DENEID WITHOUT PREJUDICE as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/28/2019. (AHI)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that plaintiff's #10 Motion to Amended the Report of Parties' Planning Meeting is DENIED AS MOOT as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/24/2019. (AHI)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION that Section 3 of Initial Disclosure date of May 27, 2019 be replaced with June 3, 2019; and that Section 8 Joinder and Amendment be changed from 6/3/2019 to 7/3/2019 by Dennis Eason. (AHI)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Records Regarding Evictions by Dennis Eason. (AHI)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing a Supplement to #6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Dennis Eason (AHI)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: that certain time limits and deadlines apply as set out in this order; Discovery due by 8/30/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2019; Witness and Exhibit Lists due by 12/30/2019; Trial ready by 1/2020. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/9/2019. (AHI)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Turnage, Amanda)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Huntsville Housing Authority. filed by Huntsville Housing Authority (Turnage, Amanda)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Letter to Court regarding case removed from state court and REQUEST for a Jury Trial by Dennis Eason (AHI)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 04/02/19. (SPT )
April 2, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601096485 (cc receipt number 11263314581) (AHI )
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Huntsville Housing Authority.(Stewart, Charles)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Huntsville Housing Authority from Circuit Court of Madison County, Alabama, case number 47-CV-19-000008 with jury demand thereon filed by Huntsville Housing Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eason v. Huntsville Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntsville Housing Authority
Represented By: Amanda James Turnage
Represented By: Charles A Stewart, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?