ALFA Mutual Insurance Company et al v. Samsung SDI Company LTD et al
Plaintiff: Erin McGinty, ALFA Mutual Insurance Company, Jack McGinty, Ryan McGinty and Emerson McGinty
Defendant: Dell Inc, Simplo Technology Company LTD, Samsung SDI America Inc, Samsung SDI Company LTD and Simplo Technology USA Logistics Company LTD
Case Number: 5:2019cv00518
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER: that certain time limits and deadlines apply as set out in this order; Discovery due by 4/3/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 5/4/2020; Witness and Exhibit List due by 5/29/2020; Trial ready by 6/2020. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 7/9/2019. (AHI)
July 8, 2019 Filing 27 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (St. John, Gaynor)
June 27, 2019 Filing 26 STATUS REPORT by ALFA Mutual Insurance Company, Erin McGinty, Ryan McGinty. filed by ALFA Mutual Insurance Company, Erin McGinty, Ryan McGinty (St. John, Gaynor)
June 21, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Simplo Technology Company LTD re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Motion to Quash Service of Process and Incorporated Brief in Support MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #22 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Simplo Technology Company LTD. (Melcher, Jeffrey)
June 10, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dell Inc. filed by Dell Inc (Dodson, John)
June 10, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Dell Inc.(Dodson, John)
June 6, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Motion to Quash Service of Process and Incorporated Brief in Support MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Emerson McGinty, Erin McGinty, Jack McGinty, Ryan McGinty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Conchin, Gary)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Dell's time to file responsive pleading is hereby extended to June 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/28/2019. (CT)
May 28, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT by Dell Inc. (Dodson, John)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion for admission pro hac vice of Lawrence Lee Washburn IV for Simplo Technology Company, LTD and Simplo Technology USA Logistices. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/20/19. (CT)
May 20, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3350084 (B4601097826). (Melcher, Jeffrey)
May 20, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Simplo Technology Company LTD, Simplo Technology USA Logistics Company LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Melcher, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER setting motion deadline #15 Motion to Dismiss. Response is due on or before June 7, 2019, and Reply is due on or before June 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/17/2019. (CT)
May 17, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Simplo Technology USA Logistics Company LTD.(Melcher, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Motion to Quash Service of Process and Incorporated Brief in Support, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Simplo Technology Company LTD. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Melcher, Jeffrey)
May 10, 2019 Filing 14 ALIAS SUMMONS Returned Executed Dell Inc no date given with signature (AHI)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/9/2019. (AHI)
May 9, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Samsung SDI America Inc. filed by Samsung SDI America Inc (Brannen, Franklin)
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Samsung SDI America Inc.(Brannen, Franklin)
May 1, 2019 Filing 10 Alias Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered via certified mail for service as to Dell Inc. (AHI)
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Samsung SDI America Inc served on 4/12/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. (AHI)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Dell Inc. "RTS - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward" (AHI)
April 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Simplo Technology Company LTD no service date given with signature (AHI)
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaintiffs as to Defendant Simplo Technology USA Logistics Company Services LLC with no date of delivery on green card. (SPT)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to plaintiff for service as to Samsung SDI Company LTD. (AHI)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered via certified mail for service as to Dell Inc, Samsung SDI America Inc, Simplo Technology Company LTD, and Simplo Technology USA Logistics Company LTD. (AHI)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALFA Mutual Insurance Company. filed by ALFA Mutual Insurance Company (St. John, Gaynor)
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by ALFA Mutual Insurance Company, Emerson McGinty, Erin McGinty, Jack McGinty, and Ryan McGinty. (AHI)
April 2, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3314593 (B4601096487). related document #1 COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against All Defendants filed by Erin McGinty, Emerson McGinty, ALFA Mutual Insurance Company, Ryan McGinty and Jack McGinty.(AHI ). (St. John, Gaynor)
April 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against All Defendants filed by Erin McGinty, Emerson McGinty, ALFA Mutual Insurance Company, Ryan McGinty and Jack McGinty.(AHI )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALFA Mutual Insurance Company et al v. Samsung SDI Company LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin McGinty
Represented By: Gary V Conchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALFA Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Gaynor L St. John
Represented By: Darla LaShay Persall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack McGinty
Represented By: Gary V Conchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan McGinty
Represented By: Gary V Conchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emerson McGinty
Represented By: Gary V Conchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell Inc
Represented By: Steven Brett Holsombeck
Represented By: John W Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simplo Technology Company LTD
Represented By: Lawrence Lee Washburn, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey W Melcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung SDI America Inc
Represented By: Franklin P Brannen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung SDI Company LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simplo Technology USA Logistics Company LTD
Represented By: Lawrence Lee Washburn, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey W Melcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?