Dzur et al v. Higgins et al
Plaintiff: Christy Dzur and Loren Dzur
Defendant: Leonard Higgins and Cynthia Higgins
Case Number: 5:2019cv00562
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: that certain time limits and deadlines apply as set out in this order; Discovery due by 12/5/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 1/10/2020; Witness and Exhibit Lists due by 3/13/2020; Trial ready by 4/2020. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/13/2019. (AHI)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Crocker, Robert)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Christy Dzur, Loren Dzur.(Willingham, Dan)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 04/19/19. (SPT)
April 18, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3326220(receipt number B4601096894). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cynthia Higgins and Leonard Higgins from Circuit Court of Cullman County, Alabama, case number 25-CV-2019-900088 filed by Cynthia Higgins and Leonard Higgins. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(AHI ). (Crocker, Robert) Modified on 4/19/2019 (BJL).
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Cynthia Higgins, Leonard Higgins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Crocker, Robert)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cynthia Higgins and Leonard Higgins from Circuit Court of Cullman County, Alabama, case number 25-CV-2019-900088 filed by Cynthia Higgins and Leonard Higgins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(AHI )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dzur et al v. Higgins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Dzur
Represented By: Dan J Willingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loren Dzur
Represented By: Dan J Willingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Higgins
Represented By: Robert Champ Crocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Higgins
Represented By: Robert Champ Crocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?