Cox v. Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth Cox
Defendant: Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc and Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00577
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE by Kenneth Cox Consents to Join Dawn Creswell and Michael Perdue (Jackson, Gordon)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PROTECTIVE ORDER that certain documents and information shall remain confidential as set out in this order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 7/8/2019. (AHI)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TEXT ORDER granting #39 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/27/2019. (KBW)
June 25, 2019 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc, Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution LLC. (Block, David)
June 20, 2019 Filing 38 AMENDED REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreed Joint Protective Order)(Block, David)
June 14, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike filed by Kenneth Cox. (Morelli, Robert)
June 14, 2019 Filing 36 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Block, David)
June 5, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3361679. (B4601098189) (Block, David)
June 5, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3361672.(B4601098190) (Block, David)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TEXT ORDER granting #33 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/5/2019. (KBW)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ORDER granting #32 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/5/2019. (KBW)
June 3, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3360215. (Block, David) ***REFUNDED 6/4/2019 due to Fee Increase***
June 3, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lauren E. Marzullo by Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc, Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Block, David)
June 3, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3360157. (Block, David) ***REFUNDED 6/4/2019 due to Fee Increase***
June 3, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael J. Puma by Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc, Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Block, David)
May 31, 2019 Filing 31 CONSENT to Become Op-In Plaintiff by Kenneth Cox Consent to Join Karl Edmondson (Jackson, Gordon)
May 31, 2019 Filing 30 CONSENT to Become Op-In Plaintiffs by Kenneth Cox Consents to Join Darrell Jones, Anthony Simpson, Christopher Williams and Leslie R. Valerie (Jackson, Gordon)
May 24, 2019 Filing 29 Brief re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of David Aussicker in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike)(Block, David)
May 24, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike by Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc, Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution LLC. (Block, David)
May 24, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by David R Beasley on behalf of All Defendants (Beasley, David)
May 24, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by David B Block on behalf of All Defendants (Block, David)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/13/2019. (AHI)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The defendant has until 5/24/2019, to respond to the plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/13/2019. (KBW)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Limited Admission. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/13/2019. (KBW)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Limited Admission. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/13/2019. (KBW)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Limited Admission. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/13/2019. (KBW)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Limited Admission. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/13/2019. (KBW)
May 13, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT this case is Reassigned to Judge Liles C Burke. Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 5:19-CV-577-LCB on all subsequent pleadings. (AHI)
May 10, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc, Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution LLC. (Shah, Vishal)
May 10, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable C. Lynwood Smith, Jr. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 5:19-cv-577-CLS on all subsequent pleadings. (BJL) Modified on 5/13/2019 (SPT, ).
May 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Consent to Become Opt-In Plaintiff by Kenneth Cox (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Linville, Kimberly) Modified on 5/9/2019 (BJL).
May 9, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3343116 (B4601097579). (Linville, Kimberly)
May 9, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3343108 (B4601097578). (Linville, Kimberly)
May 9, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3343091 (B4601097577). (Linville, Kimberly)
May 9, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3343085 (B4601097576). (Linville, Kimberly)
May 8, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution LLC. filed by Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution LLC (Shah, Vishal)
May 8, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc. filed by Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc (Shah, Vishal)
May 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Vishal H Shah on behalf of Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc, Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution LLC (Shah, Vishal)
May 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert Morelli Motion is RIPE 5/7/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Kenneth Cox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Linville, Kimberly)
May 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. Russ Bryant Motion is RIPE 5/7/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Kenneth Cox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Linville, Kimberly)
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paula R. Jackson Motion is RIPE 5/7/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Kenneth Cox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Linville, Kimberly)
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gordon E. Jackson Motion is RIPE 5/7/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Kenneth Cox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Linville, Kimberly)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER finding as moot #5 Motion for Limited Admission and granting #7 Motion for Limited Admission for Michael L. Weinman to appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/2/19. (BJL)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 Amended MOTION for Limited Admission of Michael L. Weinman Motion is RIPE 5/2/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Kenneth Cox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Linville, Kimberly)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc served on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019; Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution LLC served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. (BJL)
April 25, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3331474 (receipt number B4601097041). (Linville, Kimberly) Modified on 4/29/2019 (BJL).
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Limited Admission of Michael L. Weinman Motion is RIPE 4/23/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Kenneth Cox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Linville, Kimberly)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc and Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution LLC by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Kenneth Cox. (Linville, Kimberly)
April 16, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3324619 (B4601096866). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc and Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution LLC filed by Kenneth Cox. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(BJL). (Linville, Kimberly)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc and Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution LLC filed by Kenneth Cox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Cox
Represented By: Ian Michael Berry
Represented By: Larry B Moore
Represented By: Kimberly Elam Linville
Represented By: Robert E Morelli
Represented By: Michael L Weinman
Represented By: Paula R Jackson
Represented By: J Russ Bryant
Represented By: Gordon E Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc
Represented By: Michael J Puma
Represented By: Vishal H Shah
Represented By: Lauren E Marzullo
Represented By: David B Block
Represented By: David R Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution LLC
Represented By: Michael J Puma
Represented By: Vishal H Shah
Represented By: Lauren E Marzullo
Represented By: David B Block
Represented By: David R Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?