Odom v. Cherry Restaurant Group of Huntsville LLC
Plaintiff: Sheila Odom
Defendant: Cherry Restaurant Group of Huntsville LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00634
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SHOW CAUSE ORDER it is ORDERED that Plaintiff SHOW CAUSE, in writing, on or before, 7/11/2019, why the claims against Defendant should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 6/24/2019. (AFS)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Cherry Restaurant Group of Huntsville LLC served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (AFS)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cherry Restaurant Group of Huntsville LLC mailed certified mail. (AFS)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Sheila Odom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons)(Hodges, Jeremiah)
April 29, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $400.00, (ALND B4601097134) receipt_number 1126-3334922. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Cherry Restaurant Group of Huntsville LLC, filed by Sheila Odom.(KEK). (Hodges, Jeremiah) Modified on 4/30/2019 (AFS).
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cherry Restaurant Group of Huntsville LLC, filed by Sheila Odom.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Odom v. Cherry Restaurant Group of Huntsville LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Odom
Represented By: Timothy M McFalls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherry Restaurant Group of Huntsville LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?