Ponzini v. Monsanto Company Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Larry Ponzini
Defendant: Monsanto Company Corporation and Bayer US LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00747
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Ponzini. Bayer US LLC served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Artrip, Eric)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Northern District of California for inclusion in MDL No. 2741; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk mailed to Clerk of Court in District of Northern District of California. (AFS)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Ponzini. Monsanto Company Corporation served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Artrip, Eric)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bayer US LLC, Monsanto Company Corporation given back to Plaintiff for service. (AFS)
May 17, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $400, receipt_number 1126-3348983 (ALND B 4601097764). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Bayer US LLC, Monsanto Company Corporation, filed by Larry Ponzini.(KAM). (Artrip, Eric) Modified on 5/17/2019 (AFS).
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bayer US LLC, Monsanto Company Corporation, filed by Larry Ponzini.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ponzini v. Monsanto Company Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Ponzini
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?