White v. Hines et al

Plaintiff: Reginald White, Jr
Defendant: Scott A Schuttinga and Eric W Hines
Case Number: 5:2019cv00750
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the court having received prisoner consent form the Warden is directed to deduct Monthly Payments from Prison Account of Reginald White Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/31/2019. (KEK)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 PRISONER CONSENT FORM filed by Reginald White, Jr. (KEK)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - The plaintiff has submitted an application to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by certified copies of his prison account statements. (Doc. #2 ). The application is GRANTED, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). The undersigned therefore ORDERS the plaintiff to sign and return to the Clerk of Court, within thirty (30) days of the entry date of this Order, the attached Prisoner Consent Form to signify that he wishes to continue with this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/20/2019. (KEK)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Reginald White, Jr. (KEK)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eric W Hines, Scott A Schuttinga, filed by Reginald White, Jr.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Hines et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott A Schuttinga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric W Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald White, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?