White v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Lue Bertha White
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00916
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: C Lynwood Smith
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company.(Thomas, D)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lue Bertha White. Ford Motor Company served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Esdale, R)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to plaintiff for service as to Ford Motor Company. (AHI)
June 13, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3367934 (B4601098440). related document #1 COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against Ford Motor Company filed by Lue Bertha White.(AHI ). (Esdale, R)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against Ford Motor Company filed by Lue Bertha White.(AHI )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lue Bertha White
Represented By: R Graham Esdale, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Daniel J Fortune
Represented By: D Alan Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?