Hughes v. Dunn et al
Plaintiff: Erskine Leon Hughes
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections, Jeffery Dunn, Estes and Corizon Health Care
Case Number: 5:2019cv00936
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alabama Department of Corrections, Jeffery Dunn, Corizon Health Care, Estes, filed by Erskine Leon Hughes.(KEK)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - To the extent the plaintiff asserts he has been denied mental health care, in violation of his Eighth Amendment right to adequate medical care, he must name the individual(s) who denied that care. As to both claims, the plaintiff must allege specific dates on which specific actions occurred. Therefore, the plaintiff is ORDERED to file an amended complaint, by completing a new 1983 complaint form, within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 7/23/2019. (KEK)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - The Clerk has notified the undersigned that the plaintiff has paid the filing fee for this action in full. Therefore, the warden or chief jailer of the prison or jail where the plaintiff is housed is DIRECTED to stop withholding money from the plaintiffs inmate account for payment of the filing fee in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 7/12/2019. (KEK)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the court having received prisoner consent form the Warden is directed to deduct Monthly Payments from Prison Account of Erskine Leon Hughes. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 7/11/2019. (KEK)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 PRISONER CONSENT FORM filed by Erskine Leon Hughes. (KEK)
July 10, 2019 Filing fee: $ 30, receipt number B4601099029. (KEK)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - The plaintiff has submitted an application to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by certified copies of his jail and/or prison account statements. (Doc. #2 ). The application is GRANTED, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). The plaintiffs inmate account statements indicate he received average monthly deposits of $150.00 and had an average prison or jail account balance of $122.24 for the past six months. The court therefore assesses an initial partial filing fee of $30.00 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 6/20/209. (KEK)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Erskine Leon Hughes. (KEK)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alabama Department of Corrections, Jeffery Dunn, filed by Erskine Leon Hughes.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. Dunn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erskine Leon Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?